Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Referred: Thomas Q Langstaff
Case #: 5:24-cv-00187
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Defendant
BIBB COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Defendant
BIBB COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY AMMONS IV

GPO Jul 29 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Because Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's orders or otherwise prosecute his case, this complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 7/29/2024. (kat)
GPO Oct 04 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Due to Plaintiff's failure to follow the Court's Orders, failure to keep the Court informed of his address, and failure to prosecute this action, the case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/4/2024. (kat)
GPO Oct 04 2024
JUDGMENT (rka)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/04 2:01 PM
Mail Returned-16 Judgment,15 Order, sent to TIMOTHY AMMONS returned as undeliverable reflecting NOT IN JAIL RETURN TO SENDER. (rka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
17 17 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/24 4:26 PM
Mail Returned-16 Judgment,15 Order, sent to TIMOTHY AMMONS returned as undeliverable reflecting NOT IN JAIL RETURN TO SENDER. (rka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Fri 10/04 4:12 PM
JUDGMENT (rka)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/04 1:25 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Due to Plaintiff's failure to follow the Court's Orders, failure to keep the Court informed of his address, and failure to prosecute this action, the case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/4/2024. (kat)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 misc Mail Returned Mon 09/16 11:24 AM
Mail Returned-7 Judgment,6 Order, sent to Timothy Ammons, IV returned as undeliverable reflecting not in jail. (bcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 09/13 8:50 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directed to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 9/13/2024. (dac)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Thu 09/12 3:13 PM
Mail Returned-11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, sent to TIMOTHY AMMONS returned as undeliverable reflecting NOT IN JAIL RETURN TO SENDER. (rka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/21 3:51 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $29.61. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 8/21/2024. (dac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 9:59 AM
ORDER VACATING6 Order of Dismissal and7 Judgment. This civil action is now RECOMMITED to the United States Magistrate Judge for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 and the order referring this case to the Magistrate Judge for preliminary matters3 . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/13/2024. (kat)
Related: [-]
utility Motion(s) Referred Tue 08/13 1:59 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to US Magistrate Judge. Entry made for housekeeping purposes since motion had to be reopened pursuant to10 Order. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(ans)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Fri 08/09 11:25 AM
Letter regarding filing fees and condition of Bibb LEC. (rka)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 08/09 11:21 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by TIMOTHY AMMONS, IV(rka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 order Judgment Tue 07/30 8:48 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/29 1:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Because Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's orders or otherwise prosecute his case, this complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 7/29/2024. (kat)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/08 4:22 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directed to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 7/8/2024. (TQL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order to File Prisoner Account Statement Mon 06/17 1:27 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff File Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy). Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 6/17/2024. (TQL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 06/14 9:12 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 6/14/2024. (elp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/14 8:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TIMOTHY AMMONS, IV.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(elp)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Fri 06/14 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT against BIBB COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE, BIBB COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE filed by TIMOTHY AMMONS, IV(elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope