District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:24-cv-01701
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Case in other court:California Southern, 3:24-cv-00033
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Brian J. Boyd
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Doj-Civ
contact info
Sarah Elisabeth Whitman
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON BABBITT
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF ASHLI BABBITT
Represented By
Robert Patrick Sticht
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info

GPO Mar 08 2024
ORDER Granting Application to Extend Time to Respond (Doc. No. 6). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/7/2024. (bdc)(jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/14/2024.]
GPO Jan 15 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 21 Motion to Retransfer Venue to the Southern District of California. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 1/15/2025. (lcacr1) (Main Document 43 replaced on 1/16/2025) (zcdw). Modified on 1/17/2025 to update document type (zcdw).

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
56 56 misc Status Report Thu 05/08 2:23 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Boyd, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Thu 05/08 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties56 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties submit a further Joint Status Report on or before May 22, 2025, updating the Court on developments in this case. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 5/8/2025. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
55 55 misc Status Report Tue 05/06 6:11 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyd, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
54 54 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 05/02 10:39 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Terrell Non Roberts, III. (Roberts, Terrell)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 05/02 11:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court ORDERS Mr. Roberts to submit to the Court the retainer letter he entered with Aaron Babbitt. If Mr. Roberts objects to filing the letter on the public docket, he may file it under seal or provide it directly to the Court to review ex parte. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 5/2/2025. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 05/02 11:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court will hold a hearing on Mr. Roberts'54 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order today at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 12. Interested parties may access the Court's dial-in line. The Public Access telephone number is 1-833-990-9400, and the meeting ID is 787605272. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 5/2/2025. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/02 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for hybrid proceedings held before Judge Ana C. Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2025 re54 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion heard and denied. Parties directed to submit a joint status report by no later than 5/6/2025. (Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (zcdw)
Related: [-]