Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Case #: 4:24-cv-00542
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 2:51 AM CST
Defendant
Sony Electronics, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Sony Group Corporation
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Freedom Patents LLC
Represented By
Catherine Susan Bartles
The Stafford Davis Firm, Pc - Tyler
contact info
Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
The Stafford Davis Firm, Pc - Tyler
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Hannah D. Price
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
19 19 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 10/01 10:38 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rpc)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 10/01 10:35 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/1/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss Tue 09/24 10:10 AM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by Freedom Patents LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Tue 08/20 4:30 PM
ORDER granting15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 9, 2024. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/20/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/10 5:17 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC.(Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/28 11:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC served on 6/20/2024. (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/28 11:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Sony Group Corporation served on 6/20/2024. (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/28 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Sony Electronics, Inc. served on 6/20/2024. (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/24 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hannah D. Price on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Price, Hannah)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/24 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/24 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/21 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/18 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Freedom Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 06/18 3:04 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Freedom Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (rpc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Electronics, Inc. (rpc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 3:46 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Group Corporation. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 06/14 11:26 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/14 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10190227.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2024) (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A [686 Patent vs. Sony 802.11ax MIMO Wi-Fi Accused Products],
Att: 3 Exhibit B ['096 Patent vs. Sony 802.11ax MIMO Wi-Fi Accused Products],
Att: 4 Exhibit C [815 Patent vs. Sony 802.11ax MIMO Wi-Fi Accused Products]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/14 12:33 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 06/14 12:34 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]