Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. P&O Ferrymasters Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01397 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
P&O Ferrymasters Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for Default Judgment filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 6/2/2025, (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against P&O Ferrymasters Ltd. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Affidavit of Service filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against P&O Ferrymasters Ltd. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-01397 Complaint against P&O Ferrymasters Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 06/14 4:19 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01397 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16670009. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |