California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:24-cv-05028
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
PNMAC Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Donald Umhofer
Umhofer, Mitchell And King LLP
contact info
Jonas Palmer Mann
Umhofer, Mitchell And King LLP
contact info
Defendant
PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust
Represented By
Matthew Donald Umhofer
Umhofer, Mitchell And King LLP
contact info
Melissa B. Collins
Williams And Connolly LLP
contact info
Steven M. Farina
Williams And Connolly LLP
contact info
Jonas Palmer Mann
Umhofer, Mitchell And King LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roberto Verthelyi
Represented By
Catherine Pratsinakis
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Pierce Hans Stanley
Cotchett, Pitre And Mccarthy, LLP
contact info
Daniel Goldman
Bienert Katzman Littrell Williams LLP
contact info
Nicole Lavallee
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Jeffrey V Rocha
Berman Tabacco
contact info
Daniel E Barenbaum
Berman Tabacco
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
64 64 order Certify Mon 05/05 5:56 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND STAYING ACTION53 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the reasons set forth above, the Motion is GRANTED.This action is STAYED pending a decision by the Ninth Circuit. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report every 90 days, with the first report due no later than August 4, 2025, or within ten days of any ruling by the Ninth Circuit. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
63 63 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Mon 04/28 11:39 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants PNMAC Capital Management, LLC, PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jon Powell at jon@umklaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Umhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
62 62 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Mon 04/28 10:49 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Roberto Verthelyi for Court Reporter. (Barenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
61 61 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 04/28 9:46 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL53 Motion Hearing held by Zoom before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk issues the Court's tentative ruling, prior to the hearing. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Counsel for Plaintiff: Catherine Pratsinakis, Daniel E. Barenbaum. Counsel for Defendants: Steven Farina, Jonas P. Mann. Courtroom Deputy: Rita Sanchez. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. Time in court: 20. (rs)
Related: [-]