California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:24-cv-01292
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 12:46 AM PST
Defendant
Dinuba Warner LLC
Defendant
Eighth Element Tattoo LLC
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Julio Cruz
Represented By
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 08/28 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 08/20 4:45 PM
MMINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having been notified by a Notice of Settlement16 that the case settled, hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. See document for further information. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Settlement Tue 08/20 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 08/13 3:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/20/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Mon 07/29 10:14 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's State Law Claims by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court DISMISSES Plaintiff's state law claims (Causes of Action Two, Three, Four and Five) WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to any action filed in state court (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 07/23 2:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant Eighth Element Tattoo LLC served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRANK THANH TRAN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
12 12 misc Response Wed 07/10 2:36 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruzto Order to Show Cause,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/08 3:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant Dinuba Warner LLC served on 7/2/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ALLAN A. NICCOLA, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 06/26 4:47 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re Supplemental Jurisdiction by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing why this court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims asserted in the Complaint on or before 7/10/2024 at 5:00 PM. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/17 3:25 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 16, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sun 06/16 8:18 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Dinuba Warner LLC, Eighth Element Tattoo LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 06/16 8:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 06/16 8:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 06/16 8:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 06/14 11:55 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/14 11:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/14 11:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/14 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37659626 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Julio Cruz(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]