Idaho District Court
Judge:David C Nye
Case #: 4:24-cv-00285
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 1:29 AM MST
Defendant
Big Sky Hospitality
4045 Backwoods Drive
Billings, MT 59106
Defendant
Trevor Haar
an individual 11430 N. 188th Lane
Surprise, AZ 85388
Plaintiff
Ashton Inn LLC
164 White Pines Ave
Ashton, ID 83420
Represented By
John Michael Avondet
Beard St. Clair Gaffney
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Huerta
164 White Pines Ave
Ashton, ID 83420
Represented By
John Michael Avondet
Beard St. Clair Gaffney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
James Haar
Terminated: 06/28/2024
an individual 14812 E. Shadow Canyon Drive
Fountain Hills, AZ 85268
Represented By
Jared Michael LeFevre
Crowley, Haughey, Hanson, Toole & Dietrich, P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Janet Haar
Terminated: 06/28/2024
an individual 14812 E. Shadow Canyon Dr.
Fountain Hills, AZ 85268
Represented By
Jared Michael LeFevre
Crowley, Haughey, Hanson, Toole & Dietrich, P.L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 order Judgment Mon 03/17 5:56 PM
JUDGMENT - The Court hereby orders as follows: Judgment is entered against the Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $1,050,858.54 in economic damages and $50,000 in non-economic damages, for a total judgment of $1,100,858.54. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
17 17 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Evidentiary Hearing Tue 01/28 1:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C. Nye: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/27/2025. Counsel offered proffer of witness testimony. Counsel to submit draft Judgment for Court's review and signature. (Court Reporter: Anne Bowline) (jm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 12/11 5:09 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt.15 ) is GRANTED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2), the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing to determine the amount of damages. Said hearing will be held on January 27, 2025, at 2:00p.m. Once the Court has determined the appropriate damages award, it will enter aseparate judgment. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 12/11 5:12 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/27/2025 02:00 PM in Other before Judge David C. Nye. (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
15 15 motion Default Judgment Fri 10/11 12:39 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Big Sky Hospitality, LLC and Trevor Haar John Michael Avondet appearing for Plaintiffs Ashton Inn LLC, Carlos Huerta. Responses due by 11/1/2024(Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 09/16 4:00 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Big Sky Hospitality, Trevor Haar(ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Tue 08/27 9:42 AM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
13 13 motion Entry of Default Mon 08/19 9:47 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default on Big Sky Hospitality, LLC and Trevor Haar John Michael Avondet appearing for Plaintiffs Ashton Inn LLC, Carlos Huerta. Responses due by 9/9/2024 (Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Fri 08/16 3:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons to Big Sky Hospitality, Summons to Trevor Haar served on Big Sky Hospitality, and Trevor Haar on 7 7-2024 filed by Ashton Inn LLC, Carlos Huerta. (Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 07/01 2:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Big Sky Hospitality, Trevor Haar. (Print attached Summons for service.)(ac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, June 28, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/01 8:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING JANET HAAR AND JAMES HAAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants, Janet Haar and James Haar, be dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear their respective fees and costs. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/26 4:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/26 2:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Janet Haar and James Haar Without Prejudice by Ashton Inn LLC, Carlos Huerta. (Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Tue 06/25 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ashton Inn LLC, Big Sky Hospitality, James Haar, Janet Haar, Trevor Haar, Carlos Huerta re. dkt.1 Notice of Removal Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/26/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Tue 06/25 10:09 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Based upon Defendants' recent filing (Dkt.3 ) it appears they understand a previously filed motion in state court to be pending in this court. For organizational purposes, the Court typically requires that any pending motions from state court be refiled in federal court. It will follow that practice here. The Court is not implying Defendants need to file an entirely new motion (although sometimes certain factors/standards change between state and federal court). But because the motion is not truly "pending," there is no response deadline under the local rules. Thus, Defendants shall refile their motion (in whatever form they like) which will then trigger appropriate briefing deadlines and the matter can be adjudicated. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/24 3:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashton Inn LLC. (Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/24 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Avondet on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Avondet, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
3 3 misc Withdrawal of a document Fri 06/21 2:36 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re:1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by James Haar, Janet Haar. (LeFevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 5:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Haar, Janet Haar identifying Corporate Parent Janet Haar for Janet Haar; Corporate Parent James Haar for James Haar. (LeFevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/14 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janet Haar, James Haar from Idaho Seventh District Court, County of Fremont, Idaho, case number CV22 24-0177 (Filing fee $405 receipt numberAIDDC-2766149.), filed by Janet Haar, James Haar.(LeFevre, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proofs of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Montana Certificate of Good Standing and Annual Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Email from Trevor Haar,
Att: 5 Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet Case Summary,
Att: 7 State Court Complaint Complaint/Petition,
Att: 8 State Court Service Documents Summonses,
Att: 9 State Court Service Documents Trevor Haar,
Att: 10 State Court Service Documents James Haar,
Att: 11 State Court Service Documents Janet Haar,
Att: 12 Pending Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 13 Brief in Support of Pending Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 14 Aff of James Haar for Pending Motion,
Att: 15 Aff of Janet Haar for Pending Motion
service Return of Service/Process Assumed Tue 06/25 11:27 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - James Haar served on 6/14/2024; Janet Haar served on 6/14/2024; Trevor Haar served on 6/14/2024. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ac)
Related: [-]