New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-04566
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
NEM-RE Receivables, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Calinoff
Calinoff & Katz, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd.
Represented By
Joseph Kevin Scully
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Chantal Tran
Day Pitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
32 32 misc Bond Tue 03/18 4:49 PM
BOND in the amount of $ 403,748.42 posted by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 03/13 3:08 PM
ORDER granting30 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted leave to post a bond in the amount of $403,748.42 with the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/13/2025) (tg) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
30 30 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/12 5:36 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Bond addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph K. Scully dated March 12, 2025. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Tran, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
29 29 respoth Response (non-motion) Wed 02/19 11:55 AM
RESPONSE re:18 Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Catalina Worthing Insurance Limited's Answer to Nem-Re Receivables, LLC's Counterclaims . Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
28 28 5 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 10:41 AM
ORDER: This matter has been referred for settlement. Dkt. No. 27. Should the Parties wish to schedule a settlement conference, the Parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Christopher Davis via email by February 21, 2025 at WillisNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov to provide three mutually agreeable dates in March, April, and May. Any conference will be held in person at Courtroom 228, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Should the Parties not wish to schedule a settlement conference at this time, they should inform the Court via email by the same deadline. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 2/3/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/31 3:36 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/31/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Case Management Plan Fri 01/31 3:33 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Counsel for the parties believe the following alternative dispute resolution mechanisms may be helpful in resolving this case (check all that apply): Immediate referral to a Magistrate Judge. This case is to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Expert Deposition due by 7/21/2025. Fact Discovery due by 6/6/2025. Expert Discovery due by 7/21/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/31/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/31 3:20 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:24 Initial Report of Parties Before Pretrial Conference filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for Friday, February 7, 2025, at 10:00 A.M. is ADJOURNED sine die. The Court will enter a case management plan separately. No party may move for summary judgment without leave of the Court prior to the June 13, 2025, post-fact discovery conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/31/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
24 24 misc Initial Report of Parties Before Pretrial Conference Thu 01/30 6:25 PM
INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Tran, Chantal)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Thu 01/30 6:22 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Tran, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/21 3:02 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's counterclaims is ADJOURNED from Wednesday, January 22, 2025, to Wednesday, February 19, 2025. The Court is unlikely to grant further extensions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/21/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/21 3:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd. answer due 2/19/2025. (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/17 9:29 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph K. Scully dated January 17, 2025. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Tran, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/06 4:04 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's counterclaim is ADJOURNED from Wednesday, January 8, 2025, to Wednesday, January 22, 2025. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/6/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/06 2:02 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph K. Scully dated 01/06/2025. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 answer Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Wed 12/18 3:56 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by NEM-RE Receivables, LLC..(Calinoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Claims
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 12/18 8:46 AM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, January 10, 2025, at 10:00 A.M. is ADJOURNED to Friday, February 7, 2025, at 10:00 A.M. The deadline for the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan as detailed in the Court's Order at Dkt. 15 is extended from Thursday, January 2, 2025, to Thursday, January 30, 2025. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/17/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 12/16 3:44 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert A. Calinoff dated December 16, 2024. Document filed by NEM-RE Receivables, LLC..(Calinoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 12/13 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/13/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 10 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 12/12 4:43 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Catalina's petition to stay arbitration is GRANTED. Based on the record before it, the Court DENIES without prejudice Catalina's request for declaratory judgment that the applicable statute of limitations bars NEM RE from pursuing claims under the Reinsurance Contracts. Catalina may raise this request again on summary judgment once the parties have engaged in discovery. Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will enter a Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference under separate Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the open motion at Dkt. 1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/12/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/26 2:08 PM
ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of CHANTAL TRAN, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. As further set forth by this Order.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/26/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/23 9:18 AM
MOTION for Chantal Sullivan Tran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29791795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Tran, Chantal)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 08/23 9:24 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Chantal Sullivan Tran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29791795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/08 10:21 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc. for Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd.. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
10 10 respoth Reply Memorandum of Law (non-motion) Wed 08/07 6:41 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration In Support of Petition . Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 08/01 1:51 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply in further support of its petition to stay arbitration is extended nunc pro tunc from Wednesday, July 31, 2024, to Wednesday, August 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/1/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/31 7:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition . Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
7 7 16 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Opposition (non-motion) Wed 07/24 3:59 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by NEM-RE Receivables, LLC..(Calinoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - National Association of Insurance Commissioners Liquidator's Handbook, pp 407-411,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph Scognamiglio
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/23 2:49 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NEM-RE Receivables, LLC..(Calinoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/23 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Calinoff on behalf of NEM-RE Receivables, LLC..(Calinoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 07/19 2:34 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by not later than Friday, July 26, 2024, Defendant must either request a nunc pro tunc extension of time to file its opposition or file its opposition. If Defendant does neither, the Court will deem the Petition as unopposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by not later than Friday, July 26, 2024, Defendant must enter an appearance on the docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by not later than Tuesday, July 23, 2024, Plaintiff must serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of service on the docket. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 7/26/2024) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/19/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/03 9:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NEM-RE Receivables, LLC waiver sent on 7/2/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 06/17 10:02 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 06/17 10:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 06/17 10:03 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/14 3:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Fri 06/14 3:27 PM
PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29490031).Document filed by Catalina Worthing Insurance, Ltd...(Scully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3