New York Western District Court
Judge:Geoffrey W Crawford
Case #: 1:24-cv-00568
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
Tyler Bebak
Represented By
Robert David Bannister
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of West Seneca
Represented By
Robert David Bannister
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anthony R. Andolina
Represented By
Robert David Bannister
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Robert David Bannister
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle I. Ghani
Represented By
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp Pfalzgraf LLC
contact info
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Pfalzgraf LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/16 9:05 AM
Case reassigned to Senior District Judge Geoffrey W Crawford. Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo no longer assigned to the case. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 order Text Order Tue 04/15 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: In accordance with Second Circuit Court of Appeals Chief Judge Debra A. Livingston's designation order of March 24, 2025, this case is reassigned to the Hon. Geoffrey W. Crawford for all further proceedings. The Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo is no longer assigned to this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/15/2025. (CRT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Walsh, IV on behalf of Town of West Seneca, Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak (Walsh, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 01/24 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney: Robert D. Bannister no longer appearing for Defendants Town of West Seneca, Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, John Doe. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kenneth Cartwright on behalf of Danielle I. Ghani, Town of West Seneca, Tyler Bebak (Cartwright, Daniel)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 01/17 9:01 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel: David Walsh, Esq. (Foti Henry PLLC) is substituted for David Walsh, Esq. (Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP). CLERK TO FOLLOW UP(Cartwright, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appearance of David Walsh, Esq.
Friday, January 10, 2025
utility E-Filing Notification Fri 01/10 9:53 AM
E-filing Notification regarding:16 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, Clerk did not substitute attorneys because the document does not comply with Local Rule 83.2(c)(1). A stipulation will effectuate a substitution only where counsel certify that a successor attorney has already or will simultaneously file a notice of appearance, no evidentiary hearing or trial date has been scheduled, and the withdrawal/substitution will not require amendment of case management order deadlines. ACTION REQUIRED: Refile this document with the appropriate certification or file a motion in accordance with L.R.Civ.P. 83.2(c)(4). (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 01/09 8:28 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel: David Walsh, Esq. (Foti Henry PLLC) is substituted for David Walsh, Esq. (Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP). CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Walsh, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 11/25 3:34 PM
Letter filed by Town of West Seneca, Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, John Doe . (Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
14 14 9 pgs respm Reply/Response Fri 11/01 11:10 AM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Memorandum of Law in Reply) filed by Town of West Seneca, Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, John Doe. (Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
13 13 order Text Order Fri 10/11 1:36 PM
TEXT ORDER granting request for an extension of time to reply filed by the defendants, Docket Item12 , until 11/1/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/11/2024. (ZHM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 10/09 9:08 AM
Letter filed by John Doe, Tyler Bebak, Anthony R. Andolina, Town of West Seneca Letter to Judge Vilardo . (Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 26 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/08 11:38 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Danielle I. Ghani. (Davenport, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/23 4:08 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, Town of West Seneca.(Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Memorandum in Support
Monday, August 26, 2024
9 9 order Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 08/26 11:43 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the amended complaint, the pending motion to dismiss, Docket Item6 , is DENIED without prejudice as moot. The defendants shall respond to the amended complaint by 9/23/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/26/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/23 10:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Danielle I. Ghani.(Davenport, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
7 7 order Text Order Mon 08/05 12:05 PM
TEXT ORDER re:6 Motion to Dismiss. The defendants have moved to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), arguing that the complaint fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Without expressing any view as to the merits of that motion, the Court will give the plaintiff an opportunity to cure the alleged defects by filing an amended complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). If the plaintiff timely files an amended complaint, the Court will deny the pending motion to dismiss without prejudice as moot. If the plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, the plaintiff must respond to the motion to dismiss. Therefore, the plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or a response to the motion to dismiss by 8/23/2024. If the plaintiff files an amended complaint, then the defendants must answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within 30 days of its filing. If the plaintiff files a response to the motion to dismiss, then the defendants may reply by 9/6/2024. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at a later time. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case by the assigned magistrate judge. In particular, the parties may consent to have only the pending motion to dismiss resolved by a magistrate judge, in which case the motion likely will be resolved sooner than if it is handled by this Court. Consent forms may be found on the Court 's website at https://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/forms-3. No adverse substantive consequences will result should the parties choose not to consent. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/5/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 08/02 4:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, John Doe, Town of West Seneca. Responses due by 8/16/2024.(Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Memorandum in Support
Monday, July 08, 2024
5 5 order Text Order Mon 07/08 11:02 AM
TEXT ORDER: The stipulation, Docket Item4 , extending the defendants' time to respond to the complaint until 8/4/2024 is SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/8/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 07/03 12:06 PM
STIPULATION (Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer) by Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, John Doe, Town of West Seneca. (Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/03 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Bannister on behalf of All Defendants (Bannister, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 11:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Anthony R. Andolina, Tyler Bebak, Town of West Seneca. (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/17 10:54 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 06/17 10:56 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 06/17 10:56 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/14 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5206997, filed by Danielle Ghani.(Davenport, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Andolina,
Att: 2 Summons Bebak,
Att: 3 Town of West Seneca Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet