Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00325
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 4:28 AM EST
Defendant
Stephen Caraway
Represented By
Chad Michael Eggspuehler
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shayla Davis
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christina Hagan
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Karl Kerschner
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ernest Knight
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Lyall
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ohio Elections Commission
77 S. High Street Suite 1850
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Secretary of State of Ohio
Represented By
Chad Michael Eggspuehler
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Charleta Tavares
Represented By
Stephanie M Chmiel
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Ethan W. Weber
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC
Represented By
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Benjamin D. Janacek
contact info
Patrick T Lewis
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Michael Grossman
Baker Hostetler
contact info
Benjamin D. Janacek
contact info
Patrick T Lewis
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Attorney General of Ohio
Terminated: 08/09/2024
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Ohio Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 05/14 1:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins: Oral argument re Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF26 ) held on 5/14/2025. Attorney Appearances: Attorney Andrew Grossman appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs; Attorney Chad Eggspuehler appeared as special counsel on behalf of the Secretary of State of Ohio; Attorneys Muna Abdullah and Stephanie Chmiel appeared on behalf of Ohio Election Commission and individually named Defendants. Argument heard. Matters taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Linda Mullen) (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 05/12 3:40 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of In-Person Oral Argument on Motion26 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Please note the Oral Argument on the pending motion set for 5/14/2025 at 10:00 AM has a COURTROOM CHANGE to Courtroom 1, Room 805 - Cincinnati before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 12:15 PM
ORDER Excusing Trial Attorney Attendance. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 5/8/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/20 11:30 AM
ORDER granting42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Taehyun Park terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 3/20/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
42 42 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/19 12:18 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
41 41 misc Reply (non motion) Fri 03/07 8:56 PM
Reply in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis, Christina Hagan, Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/24 10:48 AM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before March 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 2/24/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/21 3:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/7/2025. to File their Reply in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Shayla Davis, Christina Hagan, Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Muna Abdallah for Defendants Stephen Caraway, Christina Hagan, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares (Abdallah, Muna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
37 37 misc Brief Tue 02/18 4:35 PM
BRIEF by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (kmc)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 02/18 4:15 PM
ORDER granting31 U.S. Chamber's Motion to participate as amicus curiae in this case. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 2/18/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 2:47 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caleb P. Burns; granting33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William K. Lane III; granting34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel T. Park as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 02/18/2025. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
35 35 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 4:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (King, James)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/14 4:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10378930) of Daniel T. Park by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (King, James)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/14 4:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10378927) of William K. Lane III by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (King, James)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/14 4:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10378924) of Caleb P. Burns by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (King, James)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/14 4:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief and to Appear as Amicus Curiae by Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (King, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Amicus Brief)
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A King for Amicus Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (King, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/07 5:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc.. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 01/22 9:20 AM
NOTICE of In-Person Oral Argument on26 Motion for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument on the pending motion is set for 5/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 822 - Cincinnati before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/17 6:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares, Christina Hagan, Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stephanie Chmiel in Support of Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-A - United Auto Workers Local Union 1112 v. Blackwell, 2005 WL 991248 (Ct. Comm. Pl. Mar. 7, 2005),
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-B - OEC Advisory Opinion 96ELC-03,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-C - OEC Advisory Opinion, 2000ELC-01,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1-D - OEC Advisory Opinion 2010ELC-02,
Att: 6 f.Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts and Counterstatement of Material Facts
27 27 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/17 4:26 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Secretary of State of Ohio. (Eggspuehler, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 01/08 1:29 PM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/8/2025. Attorney Appearances: Attorneys Patrick Lewis and Andrew Grossman appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff; Attorney Stephanie Chmiel appeared on behalf of the Ohio Elections Commission and individually named Defendants; and Attorney Chad Eggspuehler appeared as special counsel on behalf of the Secretary of State of Ohio. Case matters discussed. Counsel shall adhere to the Briefing Schedule as outlined in the Courts25 Order. Pending its review of the26 Motion for Summary Judgment and its forthcoming decision as to whether oral argument is necessary, the Court shall issue a separate notice to the parties regarding the scheduling of that proposed hearing. (Court Reporter: Linda Mullen) (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
26 26 motion Summary Judgment Tue 12/03 3:44 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew M. Grossman,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Tony Long
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 12/03 12:10 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment, Set a Briefing Schedule, and Stay Discovery. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file their Motion for Summary Judgment and the corresponding declarations, currently lodged with the Parties' Joint Motion for Leave as Exhibits A, B, and C, as a separate case filing in accordance with the Local Rules of the Southern District of Ohio. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 1/8/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins. Counsel shall use the conference line information detailed in the 9/13/2024 notice of hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 12/3/2024. (kmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Mon 12/02 5:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment, Set a Briefing Schedule, and Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC, Defendant Secretary of State of Ohio. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 11/27 12:15 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to File Withdraw and NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel (Docs.18 and22 ). Counsel are reminded going forward they should comply with Rule 83.4 (b) of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 11/27/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/26 3:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Withdraw as Special Counsel for Certain Defendants by Defendants Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares, Christina Hagan, Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis. (Eggspuehler, Chad)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 11/26 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Stephanie M Chmiel substituting for Chad Michael Eggspuehler and Ethan W. Weber as to Defendants Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares, Christina Hagan, Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/22 3:49 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC re19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10259196) of Benjamin D. Janacek (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/22 4:26 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin D. Janacek as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/22/2024. (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Thu 11/21 1:42 PM
Notice of Deficiency re: Certificate of Good Standing. The Certificate of Good Standing is not from the highest court of a state or the District of Columbia. Related Document:19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin D. Janacek filed by Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc. Deficiency Deadline by 12/5/2024. (eh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
19 19 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/20 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10259196) of Benjamin D. Janacek by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc., Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 11/19 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Stephanie M Chmiel substituting for Chad Michael Eggspuehler and Ethan W. Weber as to Defendant Ohio Elections Commission. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/13 5:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Secretary of State of Ohio. (Eggspuehler, Chad)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/13 4:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis, Christina Hagan, Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Charleta Tavares. (Eggspuehler, Chad)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/13 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan W. Weber for Defendants Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis, Christina Hagan, Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Secretary of State of Ohio, Charleta Tavares (Weber, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 08/09 10:04 AM
ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendant Attorney General of Ohio is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICED. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 8/9/2024. (eh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/02 6:35 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant, Attorney General Dave Yost, From This Action (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/09 4:18 PM
Set Deadlines re docs.10 ,11 &12 : Attorney General of Ohio answer due 8/13/2024; Stephen Caraway answer due 8/13/2024; Shayla Davis answer due 8/13/2024; Christina Hagan answer due 8/13/2024; Karl Kerschner answer due 8/13/2024; Ernest Knight answer due 8/13/2024; John Lyall answer due 8/13/2024; Ohio Elections Commission answer due 8/13/2024; Secretary of State of Ohio answer due 8/13/2024; Charleta Tavares answer due 8/13/2024. (eh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/08 9:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/08 9:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/08 9:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 07/03 11:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis, Christina Hagan, Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Secretary of State of Ohio, Charleta Tavares. (kh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/02 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Michael Eggspuehler for Defendants Stephen Caraway, Shayla Davis, Christina Hagan, Karl Kerschner, Ernest Knight, John Lyall, Ohio Elections Commission, Secretary of State of Ohio, Charleta Tavares (Eggspuehler, Chad)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/02 1:40 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Summons Form Secretary of State LaRose (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form Karl C. Kerschner,
Att: 2 Summons Form Ernest C. Knight,
Att: 3 Summons Form John A. Lyall,
Att: 4 Summons Form Charleta B. Tavares,
Att: 5 Summons Form Christina M. Hagan,
Att: 6 Summons Form Shayla L. Davis,
Att: 7 Summons Form Stephen Caraway,
Att: 8 Summons Form Ohio Elections Commission
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Yackshaw for Defendant Attorney General of Ohio (Yackshaw, Ann)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Buchanan for Defendant Attorney General of Ohio (Buchanan, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 8:10 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Grossman. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/20/2024. (kev)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
4 4 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/19 5:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10027326) of Andrew M. Grossman by Plaintiffs Ohio Chamber of Commerce PAC, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Inc.. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, June 14, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 3:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ohio Chamber of Commerce Political Action Committee. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/14 3:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ohio Chamber Of Commerce. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/14 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10021468), filed by Ohio Chamber of Commerce Political Action Committee, Ohio Chamber Of Commerce. (Lewis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Docket Annotation Fri 06/14 4:15 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc)
Related: [-]