Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:24-cv-01481
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause12:22 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 4:15 AM CST
Defendant
Caleb Matthew Maddix
Defendant
Ryan Paul O'Donnell
Defendant
Joseph Western
Defendant
Air AI Technologies Inc
Defendant
Crafting.Dance LLC
Plaintiff
Healthy Home 365 LLC
Represented By
Robin G Bechtold
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Apex Holdings Group Inc
Terminated: 07/15/2024


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 2 pgs service Summons Returned Mon 03/24 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Caleb Matthew Maddix. (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 4:06 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion Alternative Service. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Healthy Homes may complete service of process on Defendant Caleb Maddix by texting a copy of Healthy Homes First Amended Complaint and a copy of the summons. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/21/2025) (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/13 10:19 AM
MOTION Alternative Service re11 MOTION alternative service for Maddix and extension of answer deadline for Western Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Joseph Western filed by Healthy Home 365 LLC (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/13 10:21 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice11 Motion for Alternative Service. The Court orders Plaintiffs to make one additional attempt to effect service under Texas Rule of Civil Procedure 106(a), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e)(2), or Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(h)(1)(B) before renewing its Motion. The Court denies as moot12 Motion for Alternative Service. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/13/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/10 11:50 AM
MOTION a ruling on motion for alternative service re11 MOTION alternative service for Maddix and extension of answer deadline for Western Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Joseph Western filed by Healthy Home 365 LLC (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/05 2:31 PM
MOTION alternative service for Maddix and extension of answer deadline for Western (), Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Joseph Western filed by Healthy Home 365 LLC (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) Western Affidaivt,
Att: 2 Declaration(s) Bechtold Declaration
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Fri 08/30 2:28 PM
SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ordered Defendant Air AI Technologies, Inc. f/k/a Air AI, LLC ("Air AI") to show cause by August 13, 2024 for its failure to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. See Doc.9 , Order. Air AI has failed to comply. The Court ORDERS one final time that by Monday September 9, 2024, Air AI must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why it has failed to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Failure to comply with this Order may result in default judgment against Defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/30/2024) (cea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Tue 08/06 2:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Air AI must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why it has failed to file an answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Failure to comply with this Order may result in default judgment against Air AI without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 8/13/2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/6/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 9:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Crafting.Dance LLC. (axm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/15 5:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Requesting Issuance of Summons for Crafting.Dance against All Defendants filed by Healthy Home 365. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Fri 07/12 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Air AI Technologies Inc ; served on 7/11/2024. (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 1:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Air AI Technologies Inc, Apex Holdings Group Inc, Caleb Matthew Maddix, Ryan Paul O'Donnell, Joseph Western. (ykp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Court Request For Recusal Mon 06/17 11:01 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Jane J Boyle for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:24-cv-01481-B. (cea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 06/17 1:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Healthy Home 365. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (ykp)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Boyle Mon 06/17 1:03 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/14 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Healthy Home 365. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14697296) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bechtold, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Persons