Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 4:24-bk-50506
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024

Debtor
CMTD Management, Inc.
1113 Cypress Island Hwy
Saint Martinville, LA 70582-6008
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Lucy G. Sikes
POB 52545
Lafayette, LA 70505
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101


Docket last updated: 06/15/2024 12:04 AM CDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
crditcrd Autodocket US Treasury Receipt Fri 06/14 1:53 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-50506 ) [petdoc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Related [+]. Receipt Number A24508948, in the Amount of $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 petdoc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee) Fri 06/14 1:30 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. All Schedules, Statements and Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney. Fee Amount $338, Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of CMTD Management, Inc.. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 06/17/2024. Social Security Card due by 06/17/2024. Picture Identification Card due by 06/17/2024. (Keating, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 petdoc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Fri 06/14 1:38 PM
ACCESS RESTRICTED. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT CODES. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of CMTD Management, Inc. (Keating, David) Modified on 6/14/2024 (katc)
Related: [-]
3 3 petdoc Corporate Resolution Fri 06/14 1:39 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by David Patrick Keating on behalf of CMTD Management, Inc. (Keating, David)
Related: [-]