Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00137
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 2:19 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kristin Huntington Bryant
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Marcus Abeyta (1)
Terminated: 06/04/2024


Docket last updated: 06/15/2024 3:23 AM CDT
Thursday, May 16, 2024
MOTION to Seal by USA as to Marcus Abeyta (lej)
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER granting [] Motion to Seal as to Marcus Abeyta (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/16/2024. (lej) (fcd).
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT as to Marcus Abeyta (1) (lej)
Related: [-]