California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00065
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 12:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Wajiha Korashi (2)
Represented By
Mia Crager
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
David M. Porter, FD
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office, Sacramento
contact info

GPO May 23 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/23/24 GRANTING 4 Motion, UNSEALING this case as to Wajiha Korashi (2), and AUTHORIZING the Filing of the a Redacted Complaint. The 05/17/24 Complaint and other defendant shall REMAIN SEALED until further order of the court. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies, DB) (Benson, A.)
GPO Jun 03 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Wajiha Korashi signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 6/3/2024. Status Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (CSK) before Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. The 6/6/2024 Status Conference and Detention Hearing before Judge Delaney is VACATED. The parties are not presently requesting a detention hearing or identity hearing. (Waldrop, A)
GPO Jul 03 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Wajiha Korashi signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 7/3/2024. Status Conference RESET for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (CSK) before Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. (Waldrop, A)
GPO Aug 21 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Wajiha Korashi signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 8/21/2024. Status Conference RESET for 9/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (CSK) before Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. (Waldrop, A)
GPO Sep 10 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 9/10/2024 as to Wajiha Korashi GRANTING the parties' Stipulation and Proposed Order (ECF No. 17). The 9/11/2024 Status Conference before Judge Kim is VACATED. The Court sets the following schedule: Government's extradition brief is due September 13, 2024. Defendant's opposition is due September 27, 2024 and Government's reply is October 4, 2024. Extradition Hearing set for 10/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (CSK) before Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. (Waldrop, A)
GPO Nov 01 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 11/1/24, ORDERING that Wajiha Korashi be COMMITTED to the custody of the USM pending the arrival of the duly authorized representatives of the government of Sweden, at which time the USM shall deliver her to the custody of such authorized representatives to be transported to Sweden to serve a sentence. (Certified copy served on the USM in person). (Salmeron, A) Modified on 11/1/2024 (Salmeron, A).

Docket last updated: 06/16/2024 12:48 AM PDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.