Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00444
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 2:20 AM CDT
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Charles William Brown
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Yupan Xie (1)
Terminated: 05/17/2024
Represented By
Lance B Phillips
Lance B Phillips PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/16/2024 2:49 AM CDT
Friday, May 17, 2024
Arrest of Yupan Xie in Western District of Oklahoma. (cps)
Related: [-]
1 1 STRICKEN RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Yupan Xie. (cps) Modified on 5/17/2024 (ac).
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Yupan Xie (ac)
Related: [-]
4 4 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yupan Xie (ac)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Lance B Phillips for Yupan Xie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/17/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) as to Yupan Xie held on 5/17/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Yupan Xie (1) 10,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/17/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
8 8 Appearance Bond as to Yupan Xie (1) 10,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/17/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings by Yupan Xie (ac)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER to Appear in District Where Charges are Pending as to Yupan Xie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/17/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
11 11 DPPA-ORDER as to Yupan Xie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/17/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice to Northern District of Texas of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Court Documents as to Yupan Xie. Your case number is: CR-24-20-L-21. Docket sheet and documents attached. The clerk will transmit restricted documents via email. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to newcases@okwd.uscourts.gov. (ac)
Related: [-]