Louisiana Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael A Crawford
Case #: 3:24-bk-10478
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Oct 24, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Louisiana Fire Extinguisher, Inc.
8339 Athens Ave
Baton Rouge, LA 70814-2302
Represented By
Noel Steffes Melancon
The Steffes Firm, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Christy Renee Bergeron
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 12:01 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
199 199 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Wed 03/12 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)198 Final Decree. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
198 198 order Final Decree Mon 03/10 9:16 AM
Final Decree Filed on 3/10/2025. (csmi)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 03/10 9:18 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (csmi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
court NOA Matters Thu 03/06 10:02 AM
The court will rule on this scheduled matter without a hearing and remove it from the court calendar; no appearances are required or allowed. RE: related document(s)195 Final Decree Filed by Debtor Louisiana Fire Extinguisher, Inc.. (tsal)
Related: [-]