Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:24-cv-11562
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1319 Clean Water Act
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:57 AM EST
Defendant
Amelia Joyce Inc.
424 Crockett Road
Seaford, VA 23696
Represented By
Briton P. Sparkman
Chalos & Co., P.C.
contact info
George M. Chalos
Chalos & Co., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mr. William E. Mullis
424 Crockett Rd.
Seaford, VA 23696
Represented By
Briton P. Sparkman
Chalos & Co., P.C.
contact info
George M. Chalos
Chalos & Co., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Dean Strickler
1304 White Marlin Ln
Virginia Beach, VA 23464
Represented By
Briton P. Sparkman
Chalos & Co., P.C.
contact info
George M. Chalos
Chalos & Co., P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
United States Department of Justice Environmental Enforcement Section 408 Atlantic Avenue Suite 236
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Elizabeth Yu
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Catherine Adams Fiske
United States Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 05/07 7:43 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The schedule is amended as jointly requested. All expert discovery must be completed no later than 8/25/25. Dispositive motions (if any) are due no later than 9/18/25, with Oppositions due no later than 10/18/25; a Reply may be filed only with leave of court. The court appreciates the parties' professional courtesies in working towards resolving this case. However, the court warns that, because of the age of this case and previous extensions, it is not inclined to further extension to the current schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 05/06 3:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to to one additional month to Complete Discovery and for filing dispositive motions, and oppositions, if any by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Fiske, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
20 20 order Order Wed 04/23 10:21 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re19 Notice (Other) filed by William E. Mullis, Amelia Joyce Inc., Dean Strickler,18 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The United States' expert report/Rule 26 disclosures is due by 6/2/25; defendants' is due by 6/30/25. Expert discovery, if any, will be completed by 7/25/25. Dispositive motions (if any) are due no later than 8/18/25, with Oppositions due no later than 9/8/25; a Reply may be filed only with leave of court. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
19 19 notice Notice - Other Fri 04/18 5:21 PM
NOTICE by Amelia Joyce Inc., William E. Mullis, Dean Strickler of Utilization of Experts (Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice - Other Fri 04/18 5:02 PM
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Expert Testimony (Fiske, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Sat 02/01 9:10 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and remaining pretrial schedule as follows: All fact discovery must be completed no later than 5/1/25. Dispositive motions (if any) are due no later than 6/30/25, with Oppositions due no later than 7/21/25; a Reply may be filed only with leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docketno later than 4/18/25, in order for the court to consider whether an expert isappropriate (party must offer basic Fed. R. Evid. 702 and 703 information)and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/31 10:20 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time of Pretrial Deadlines ( Responses due by 2/14/2025) by Amelia Joyce Inc., William E. Mullis, Dean Strickler.(Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 11:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Yu on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Yu, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 10/01 10:08 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George M. Chalos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/30 3:01 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of George M. Chalos Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10624812 by Amelia Joyce Inc., William E. Mullis, Dean Strickler.(Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmation of George M. Chalos in Support of Motion for PHV Admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Saturday, September 21, 2024
12 12 order Order Sat 09/21 3:06 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered - Defendants having filed Answers in this Clean Water Act case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule. Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 10/11/24. All amendments to the pleadings and/or joinder of additional parties shall be completed by 11/22/24. The court will permit 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests without leave of court and expects those requests to be filed with the opposing counsel within 30 days of the initial disclosures (no later than 11/11/24). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 3/1/25. Dispositive motions (if any) are due no later than 3/22/25, with Oppositions due no later than 4/12/25; a Reply may be filed only with leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 2/19/25, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate (party must offer basic Fed. R. Evid. 702 and 703 information) and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/20 10:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dean Strickler.(Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/20 10:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by William E. Mullis.(Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/20 10:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Amelia Joyce Inc..(Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/16 11:37 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2024 to File Answer re1 Complaint -- All Defendants. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/13 7:11 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2024 to File Answer re1 Complaint by Amelia Joyce Inc., William E. Mullis, Dean Strickler.(Sparkman, Briton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/16 11:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. William E. Mullis waiver sent on 7/15/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. (Fiske, Catherine)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/16 10:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Dean Strickler waiver sent on 7/15/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. (Fiske, Catherine)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/16 10:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Amelia Joyce Inc. waiver sent on 7/15/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. (Fiske, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/17 3:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Amelia Joyce Inc., William E. Mullis, Dean Strickler. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 06/17 3:18 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/17 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Fiske, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form