California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-05084
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 1:40 AM PST
Defendant
TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas McDowell Morrow
Lewitt Hackman Shapiro Marshall And Harlan
contact info
Jeffrey A Kobulnick
Lewitt Hackman Shapiro Marshall And Harlan
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Diana Stinnett
Represented By
Todd M Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Matthew R. Snyder
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.
contact info
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 09/11 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Diana Stinnett. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
14 14 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 08/21 3:28 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (More than 30 days)13 . Defendant TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc. answer due 9/20/2024. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 08/20 4:36 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 20, 2024 filed by Defendant TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc..(Morrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/23 6:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 07/23 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc., (Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 07/23 4:18 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 07/22 5:28 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc. answer now due 8/21/2024, filed by Defendant TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey A Kobulnick added to party TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kobulnick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/17 12:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant TaxReliefCenter.ORG, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 06/17 12:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 06/17 12:37 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 06/17 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 06/17 9:30 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Diana Stinnett. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 06/17 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Diana Stinnett, identifying TaxReliefCenter.Org, Inc.. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 06/17 9:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diana Stinnett. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/17 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37667156 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Diana Stinnett. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Diana Stinnett(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]