Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:24-cv-01458
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:47 AM EST
Defendant
Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia
Represented By
Christine E. Howard
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Brett Purcell Owens
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Metzger
Represented By
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 13, 2024
19 19 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/13 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 12/13 9:41 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for approval of settlement and dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to lift the stay and change the designation from administrative closure to a full case closure. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/13/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stay Lifted Fri 12/13 4:46 PM
Case Stay Lifted. Cleared Stayed flag. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
17 17 misc Supplement Thu 12/12 4:34 PM
SUPPLEMENT re15 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia.(Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Executed Settlement Agreement
16 16 order Order Thu 12/12 3:31 PM
ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to file a copy of the executed settlement agreement (Exhibit 1, referred to in the motion at docket 15). Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/12/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Settlement Thu 12/12 11:20 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia. (Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case Mon 07/22 5:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed 9 Motion to Compel Arbitration and stay this case pending arbitration; and denying 9 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case. The Clerk is directed to denote that this case is stayed and administratively closed. The parties must file a status report at the earlier of January 22, 2025, or the resolution of the arbitration proceeding. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/22/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/22 2:02 PM
NOTICE by Jonathan Metzger re9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation or, in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case of Non-Objection to Compel Arbitration (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Tue 07/23 9:00 AM
Case Stayed. (ELM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
12 12 order Order Tue 07/16 2:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Any objection to Doc. 9 must be on file no later than July 22, 2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/16/2024. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 07/12 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brett Purcell Owens on behalf of Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia. Lead Counsel: Brett P. Owens. (Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/12 2:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia. (Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Compel Change Venue / Transfer Case Fri 07/12 1:23 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation or, in the alternative , MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia.(Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 service Summons returned executed Thu 06/27 3:38 PM
RETURN of service executed on 06/21/2024 by Jonathan Metzger as to Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Thu 06/20 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (JS)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons issued Thu 06/20 12:32 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia. (AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 06/18 12:20 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jonathan Metzger. Related case(s): Yes (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 06/18 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Noah E. Storch on behalf of Jonathan Metzger. Lead Counsel: Noah E. Storch. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/18 12:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jonathan Metzger. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/17 3:32 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-1458-WFJ-AAS. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/17 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against Apex Systems, LLC of Virginia with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22203722) filed by Jonathan Metzger.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet