Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00558
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause12:22 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:46 AM CST
Defendant
Matthew Brown
4041 Macarthur Boulevard, Suite 400
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Defendant
Matthew Brown Companies LLC
4041 Macarthur Boulevard, Suite 400
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Plaintiff
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Patrick Disbennett
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
59 59 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Defendants Notice Regarding Non-Cooperation of Non-Party Witness Caitlin Faubion filed by Matthew Brown, Matthew Brown Companies LLC (Brown, Matthew)
Related: [-]
58 58 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Defendants Notice Regarding Non-Cooperation of Non-Party Witnesses Gingiss and Hart filed by Matthew Brown, Matthew Brown Companies LLC (Brown, Matthew)
Related: [-]
57 57 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/29 10:05 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.56 ), filed April 28, 2025. After considering the Unopposed Motion, the Court finds good cause and hereby GRANTS the Motion. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to file a response in opposition to Defendants'53 Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to May 30, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/29/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/29 10:06 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:57. Tue Apr 29 10:06:55 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
56 56 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 9:59 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Disbennett, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
55 55 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry with Option to Restrict) Fri 04/25 3:37 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.49 Order on Motion to Withdraw, Order on Motion for Judgment, Order on Motion to Stay, received back from Matthew Brown Companies LLC as Return to Sender-Not Deliverable as Addressed-Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (wxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
54 54 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 8:10 PM
NOTICE of CORRECTED FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re:52 First MOTION for Summary Judgment MSJ ,51 First MOTION for Summary Judgment ,53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Brown, Matthew Brown Companies LLC (Brown, Matthew)
Related: [-]
53 53 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 7:43 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Brown, Matthew Brown Companies LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brown, Matthew)
Related: [-]
52 52 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 7:30 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment MSJ filed by Matthew Brown, Matthew Brown Companies LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brown, Matthew)
Related: [-]
51 51 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 7:22 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Brown, Matthew Brown Companies LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brown, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s),
Att: 5 Exhibit(s),
Att: 6 Exhibit(s),
Att: 7 Exhibit(s),
Att: 8 Exhibit(s),
Att: 9 Exhibit(s),
Att: 10 Exhibit(s),
Att: 11 Exhibit(s),
Att: 12 Exhibit(s),
Att: 13 Exhibit(s),
Att: 14 Exhibit(s),
Att: 15 Exhibit(s),
Att: 16 Exhibit(s),
Att: 17 Exhibit(s),
Att: 18 Exhibit(s),
Att: 19 Exhibit(s)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
50 50 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
Subpoena Issued to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action per33 request (jnp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/22 12:34 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:50. Tue Apr 22 12:34:51 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]