Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-90377

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:24-ap-03122
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Zachry Industrial, Inc.
527 Logwood Avenue
San Antonio, TX 78221
Represented By
Zachry Industrial, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Avis Lamotte
223 Rosa Parks Ave., Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Avis Lamotte
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, January 16, 2025
37 37 misc Certificate Thu 01/16 8:15 PM
Certificate of Service re: Final Order (A) Approving the Settlement by and Between Avis Lamotte, on Her Own Behalf and on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated, and the Debtors and (B) Granting Related Relief (Filed By Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC d/b/a Verita Global ) Related [+] (Gershbein, Evan)
Related: [-] 35 Generic Order
Saturday, January 11, 2025
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/11 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Generic Order
Thursday, January 09, 2025
35 35 order Generic Order Thu 01/09 3:58 PM
Final Order (A) Approving the Settlement By and Between Avis Lamotte, On Her Own Behalf and On Behalf of Others Similarly Situated, and the Debtors and (B) Granting Related Relief, Signed on 1/9/2025 (acj4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/10 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Transcript
Monday, October 07, 2024
33 33 1 pgs court Transcript Mon 10/07 1:05 PM
Transcript RE: Motion hearing held on 09/30/24 before Judge Marvin Isgur. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Within 21 days, parties are advised to comply with privacy requirements of Fed. R. Bank. P. 9037, ensuring that certain protected information is redacted from transcripts prior to their availability on PACER. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 01/6/2025. (AccessTranscripts)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/27 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Transcript
Monday, September 23, 2024
31 31 7 pgs court Transcript Mon 09/23 8:23 PM
Transcript RE: Pretrial Conference held on 9/9/24 before Judge Marvin Isgur. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Within 21 days, parties are advised to comply with privacy requirements of Fed. R. Bank. P. 9037, ensuring that certain protected information is redacted from transcripts prior to their availability on PACER. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 12/23/2024. (AccessTranscripts)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
30 30 misc AO435 Transcript Request Thu 09/12 2:03 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Charles R. Koster. This is to order a transcript of the September 9, 2024 Hearing before Judge Marvin P. Isgur. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Access Transcripts (Filed By Zachry Industrial, Inc. ). (Koster, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
29 29 audio MP3 Mon 09/09 12:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/9/2024 10:58:51 AM ]. File Size [ 2872 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:59 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Courtroom Minutes Mon 09/09 11:30 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:58 AM - 11:05 AM. Appearances: Chales Koster for the Debtors. James Gerard Stranch for the Plaintiffs. Chris Moore for Zachry Industrial, Inc. As stated on the record, adversary proceeding and all deadlines abated. 9019 motion to be filed and self-calendared for 9/30/24. (acj4)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 09/06 6:39 PM
Status Report (Filed By Avis Lamotte ). (Stranch, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
26 26 misc Pre-Status Conference Report Fri 08/30 5:06 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report (Filed By Avis Lamotte ). (Iadevaia, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/15 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Strike
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 order Strike Tue 08/13 11:44 AM
Order on Defendant Debtors' Unopposed Motion to Strike Jury Demand Related [+] Signed on 8/13/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, August 12, 2024
23 23 misc Proposed Order Mon 08/12 2:18 PM
Proposed Order RE: Defendant Debtors' Unopposed Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Filed By Zachry Industrial, Inc. ) Related [+] (Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Strike
Monday, July 22, 2024
22 22 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/22 6:24 PM
Proposed Order RE: Defendant Debtors' Motion to Strike Jury Demand (Filed By Zachry Industrial, Inc. ) Related [+] (Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Strike
21 21 motion Strike Mon 07/22 6:22 PM
Motion to Strike. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Zachry Industrial, Inc. (Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/22 6:10 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Related [+] Filed by Zachry Industrial, Inc. (Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, July 20, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/20 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/20 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 07/17 5:34 PM
Order Granting Motion for Madeline Nebel to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 7/17/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 07/17 5:33 PM
Order Granting Motion for Patrick Hulla to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 7/17/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
15 15 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 07/16 10:27 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Madeline Nebel (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25427262) Filed by Defendant Zachry Industrial, Inc. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 07/16 10:19 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick F. Hulla (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25427255) Filed by Zachry Industrial, Inc. (Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/03 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order for Conference
12 12 misc Certificate Wed 07/03 9:29 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Avis Lamotte ) Related [+] (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-] 11 Order for Conference
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Mon 07/01 10:44 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (tjl4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/27 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/27 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 06/25 8:41 AM
Order Granting Motion for J. Gerard Stranch, IV to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 6/25/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 06/25 8:39 AM
Order Granting Motion for Michael Iadevaia to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 6/25/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, June 24, 2024
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 06/24 11:48 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Gerard Stranch, IV (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25381539) Filed by Avis Lamotte (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 06/24 11:47 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Iadevaia (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25381531) Filed by Avis Lamotte (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/20 10:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on Zachry Industrial, Inc. 6/20/2024. (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 06/20 8:22 AM
Summons Issued on Zachry Industrial, Inc. Date Issued 6/20/2024. (rlm4)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 06/17 11:32 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Zachry Industrial, Inc. (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 06/17 10:57 AM
Adversary case 24-03122 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint Class Action for Violation of WARN Act by Avis Lamotte against Zachry Industrial, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-]