North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 4:24-cv-00087
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 5:13 AM EST
Defendant
PNC Bank N.A.
Represented By
Margaret M. Manos
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
India K. Williams
940 Gray St.
Roanoke Rapids, NC 27870


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Tue 03/11 4:04 PM
Motions Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ,12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 02/13 8:55 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Victoria Street Tolbert on behalf of PNC Bank N.A. substituting for Margaret M. Manos. (Tolbert, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/16 4:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/02 5:11 PM
ORDER granting22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Reply due by 1/16/2025. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/2/2025. Copy sent via US Mail to India K. Williams at 940 Gray St., Roanoke Rapids, NC 27870. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred Thu 01/02 3:51 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/31 10:28 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time
Monday, December 23, 2024
21 21 notice Document Mon 12/23 11:52 AM
Civil Cover Sheet filed by India K. Williams. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/23 11:51 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by India K. Williams. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - PNC Timeline of Events,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Emails dated 12/24/23,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Communication dated 1/29/24,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Respondent Portal Communication
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/10 4:28 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/10/2024. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice-other Tue 12/10 11:20 AM
Civil Cover Sheet, filed by India K. Williams. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/10 11:20 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , filed by India K. Williams. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Tue 12/10 11:23 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Wed 11/20 1:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Determination and Notice of Rights
Thursday, November 14, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/14 2:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding14 Amended Complaint filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/01 11:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC Bank N.A. filed by India K. Williams. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
13 13 misc Rule 12 Letter Wed 10/09 4:05 PM
Rule 12 Letter Issued as to12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Response due by 11/1/2024. Sent to India K. Williams at 940 Gray St. Roanoke Rapids, NC 27870 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 10/08 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Determination and Notice of Rights
11 11 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 10/08 2:17 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank N.A. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/08 2:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Margaret M. Manos on behalf of PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/26 8:47 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding1 Complaint. PNC Bank N.A. answer due 10/8/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/23/2024.Copy sent via US Mail to India K. Williams at 940 Gray St., Roanoke Rapids, NC 27870. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/23 1:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Manos, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Mon 09/23 3:45 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 3:17 PM
USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - SUMMONS Returned Executed PNC Bank N.A. served on 9/3/2024, answer due 9/24/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/27 9:49 AM
Summons Issued as to PNC Bank N.A. Certified copy of5 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285 Form
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/27 9:40 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 8/26/2024. Copy sent via US Mail to India K. Williams at 940 Gray St., Roanoke Rapids, NC 27870. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
utility Motion Referred Mon 07/01 12:36 PM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 06/17 4:56 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by India K. Williams. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Self-Representation Mon 06/17 4:55 PM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by India K. Williams (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/17 4:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by India K. Williams. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/17 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against PNC Bank N.A., filed by India K. Williams. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Written Complaint,
Att: 2 EEOC Determination and Notice of Rights,
Att: 3 Information Related to Filing Suit Under the Laws Enforced by the EEOC,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons,
Att: 6 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons