Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Terry R Means
Case #: 4:24-cv-00564
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:50 AM CST
Defendant
Aledo Independent School District
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Kelly Marie Janes
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Annie M.
Represented By
Caroline Jozefczyk
King & Spalding
contact info
Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin
King & Spalding
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney M.
Represented By
Caroline Jozefczyk
King & Spalding
contact info
Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin
King & Spalding
contact info
Plaintiff
Spencer M.
Represented By
Caroline Jozefczyk
King & Spalding
contact info
Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin
King & Spalding
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
29 29 14 pgs respm Reply Wed 01/08 9:15 PM
REPLY filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. re:13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
28 28 20 pgs respm Reply Wed 01/08 7:53 PM
REPLY filed by Aledo Independent School District re:16 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
27 27 respm Appendix in Support Fri 12/20 9:44 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. re25 Response/Objection (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 12/20 9:36 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. re25 Response/Objection (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response/Objection Fri 12/20 9:33 PM
RESPONSE filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. re:16 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 19 pgs respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 12/20 9:33 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Aledo Independent School District re23 Response/Objection (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response/Objection Fri 12/20 9:30 AM
RESPONSE filed by Aledo Independent School District re:13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 12/13 2:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING THE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION: Before the Court is the Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for continuance to file response briefs in opposition of the parties' respective motions for judgment on the administrative record (doc.21 ). The Court concludes that it should be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. The deadline to file briefs in response to the pending motions for judgment on the administrative record is extended to December 20, 2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 12/13/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Continue Fri 12/13 11:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION OF THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 11/20 2:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING THE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION: Having reviewed the19 motion and the applicable law, the Court concludes that it should be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. The deadline to file briefs in response to the pending motions for judgment on the administrative record is extended to December 16, 2024. The deadline to file reply briefs in support of motions for judgment on the administrative record is extended to January 8, 2025. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 11/20/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
19 19 motion Continue Fri 11/08 3:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue filing Response and Reply Briefs in support of the parties respective Motions for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by Aledo Independent School District (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
18 18 23 pgs respm Appendix in Support Thu 10/31 7:27 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Aledo Independent School District re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 10/31 7:10 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Aledo Independent School District re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Judgment Thu 10/31 7:07 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by Aledo Independent School District (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 respm Appendix in Support Thu 10/31 6:43 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 10/31 6:41 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/31 6:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List) Thu 10/10 12:17 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 10/31/2024. Responses due by 11/27/2024., Replies due by 12/20/2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/10/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
11 11 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document Thu 09/19 9:51 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Notice: The Clerk's Office received a USB drive containing the certified administrative record in Texas Education Agency special education due process hearing docket number 096-SE-1123 filed by Aledo Independent School District. Items placed in Clerk's office under separate cover. filed by Aledo Independent School District (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 08/26 7:29 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M.. (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/06 2:07 PM
ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Jozefczyk. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/6/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/05 6:13 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Caroline Jozefczyk (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14816456) filed by Annie M., Courtney M., Spencer M. (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 order Status Report Order Tue 07/30 1:50 PM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 7/30/2024) (bdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
6 6 7 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/29 3:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Aledo Independent School District. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Aledo Independent School District(pty:dft) (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Fri 07/12 11:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aledo Independent School District ; served on 7/8/2024. (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/18 4:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Aledo Independent School District. (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
3 3 qcref Means Tue 06/18 4:31 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (saw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 06/17 6:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A. M., Courtney Morey, Spencer Morey. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/17 6:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Aledo Independent School District filed by A. M., Courtney Morey, Spencer Morey. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14701655) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet