California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:24-bk-14774
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jul 16, 2024
Dismissed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025

Debtor
BONNIE BRAE INVESTMENT, LLC
452 S Bonnie Brae St
Los Angeles, CA 90057-3015
Represented By
Giovanni Orantes
Orantes Law Firm PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Peter J Mastan (TR)
550 S Hope Street, Suite 1765
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 06/18/2024 12:04 AM PDT
Monday, June 17, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 06/17 5:16 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-14774] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56997823. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 06/17 5:10 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by BONNIE BRAE INVESTMENT, LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 07/1/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 07/1/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 07/1/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 07/1/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 07/1/2024. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 07/1/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 07/1/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 07/1/2024. (Orantes, Giovanni)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 06/17 7:06 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mastan (TR), Peter J with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/16/2024 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Mastan: Meeting ID 524 459 8731, Passcode 3158479849, Phone 1 213 833 9323. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]