Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:24-bk-11378
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
DermTech, Inc.
12340 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130
Represented By
Erin R Fay
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Marsha Sukach
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Heather P. Lambert
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Shane M. Reil
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Catherine C Lyons
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2025 10:26 AM EST
Attorney
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
Claims Agent
Stretto
www.stretto.com 410 Exchange, Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Creditor
Blue Cross Blue Shield Kansas City
Represented By
Jason Daniel Angelo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bradford Capital Management, LLC
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Dermatologic Surgery Center of DC and Dr. Maral Skelsey
Represented By
Margaret Fleming England
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Creditor
United States of America
Represented By
Andrew Warner
C/o United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Creditor
Kilroy Realty, L.P.
Represented By
Michael S Greger
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble, Et Al
contact info
Margaret A. Vesper
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Ivan Gold
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory, Et Al
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
New York State Dept of Health
Office of the NY State Atty General Civil Recoveries Bureau Bankruptcy Litigation Unit The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224
Represented By
Martin A. Mooney
Office Of The Nys Attorney General
contact info
Creditor Committee
Zymo Research Corporation
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Maria Kotsiras
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Aaron H. Stulman
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Todd M. Schwartz
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Shannon Forshay
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
David P. Simonds
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Kaitlyn A. Hittelman
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Edward J McNeilly
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Skin Surgery Medical Group, Inc
5222 Balboa Ave, 6th Floor
San Diego, CA 92117
Creditor Committee
Kilroy Realty, L.P.
12200 W. Olympic Blvd Suite 200
Los Angeles, CA 90064
Financial Advisor
AlixPartners, LLP
Represented By
Heather P. Lambert
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Thermo Fisher Scientific
Represented By
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Beverly Weiss Manne
contact info
Interested Party
Humana, Inc.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Humana Insurance Company
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Humana Government Business, Inc.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
DERM - JES HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
Jeremy Roy Johnson
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Michael Vincent DiPietro
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Other Prof.
Stretto, Inc.
Petitioning Creditor
Mohammadreza Tashakor
Represented By
Tara L. Lattomus
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
560 560 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 05/05 12:24 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
559 559 order Application for Compensation Mon 05/05 7:44 AM
Order (OMNIBUS) Approving Third Interim Fee Requests of Certain Professionals Related [+] Signed on 5/5/2025. (LMC)
Related: [-] 533 ,534 ,535 ,536 ,537 ,549
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 02, 2025
558 558 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 05/02 8:07 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
557 557 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/02 3:01 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-11379 for the Month Ending: 3/31/2025 Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
556 556 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/02 3:00 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 3/31/2025 Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
555 555 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 05/02 12:04 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
Thursday, May 01, 2025
554 554 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Thu 05/01 4:26 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) for Professional Services Rendered and reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Debtors for the period from March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by AlixPartners, LLP. Objections due by 5/22/2025. (Lyons, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
553 553 court Omnibus Hearing Dates Thu 05/01 11:15 AM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Related [+] Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 6/12/2025 at 02:00 PM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 5/1/2025. (LMC)
Related: [-] 551
552 552 notice Confirmation Hearing(Chapter 11) - Notice Thu 05/01 11:05 AM
Notice of Confirmation Hearing //Notice of Rescheduled Confirmation Hearing Date and Time Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. Confirmation Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
551 551 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 05/01 10:39 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] il, Shane
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
550 550 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Wed 04/30 6:45 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Combined Eighth Monthly Application of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C., as Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of January 1, 2025 through February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. (Lambert, Heather)
Related: [-] 526
549 549 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 04/30 12:45 PM
Certification of Counsel with respect to Omnibus Order Approving Third Interim Fee Requests of Certain Professionals Related [+] Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc..
Related: [-] 533 ,534 ,535 ,536 ,537 il, Shane
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, April 28, 2025
548 548 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Mon 04/28 3:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required with respect to Ninth Monthly Application of AlixPartners, LLC, Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from February 1, 2025 through February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by DTech Liquidating, Inc.. (Lyons, Catherine)
Related: [-] 519