Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Zachary C Bolitho
Case #: 3:24-cv-00276
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:47 AM EST
Defendant
PROFESSIONAL ACCOUNT SERVICES INC
Represented By
HECTOR E LORA
Maurice Wutscher Llp - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
GENEVA HERSOM
Represented By
GERALD DONALD LANE, JR
Law Offices Of Jibrael S Hindi - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
2 2 Summons Issued as to PROFESSIONAL ACCOUNT SERVICES INC. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against Professional Account Services Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8839231.), filed by Geneva Hersom. (LANE, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Screenshot of phone calls,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Screenshot of phone calls,
Att: 3 Supplement Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter