Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Case #: 6:24-cv-00220
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1452 Removal of Claims Related to Bankruptcy Cases
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Case in other court:Texas Northern, 5:24-cv-00041
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 3:57 AM CST
Defendant
American State Bank
Represented By
Timothy T Pridmore
Mcwhorter Cobb & Johnson
contact info
Grayson Lee Linyard
Linyard, PLLC
contact info
James W Bowen
Hunton Andrews Kurth Llp - Dallas
contact info
Jennifer Lauren Clyde
Hunton Andrews Kurth Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Steele West Texas Capital Corporation
Defendant
Steele Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By
David Joseph Beck
Beck Redden LLP
contact info
Geoff A Gannaway
Beck Redden Llp - Houston
contact info
Defendant
Brandon T. Steele
Represented By
David Joseph Beck
Beck Redden LLP
contact info
Geoff A Gannaway
Beck Redden Llp - Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
Wright-Cart, Ltd.
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Reeda Smith
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Smith
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rotom, Inc.
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Dennis Myrick
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Coy Myrick
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ken King
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Edwards
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Ebeling, Jr.
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Ebeling
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Ebeling
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cinde Ebeling
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chris Cartwright
Represented By
Austin Krist
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Timothy Alan Cleveland
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Ben Dillon
Cleveland Krist PLLC
contact info
Trustee
Diane Carter, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Steele West Texas Capital Corporation
10501 N. Central Expy., Ste. 106
Dallas, TX 75231
Represented By
Melissa Sue Hayward
Hayward & Associates Pllc - Dallas
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, July 29, 2024
utility Remark Mon 07/29 8:23 AM
Case opened in Bankruptcy Court as 24-6038 (gsm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/23 10:34 AM
ORDER Referring Case to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 7/22/2024. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/25 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Austin Krist on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10206367. (Krist, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/21 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ben Dillon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10200326. (Dillon, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
33 33 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 06/18 9:21 AM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 5:24-cv-00041. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
32 32 ORDER The Court grants the motion to transfer (Dkt. No.5 ) and transfers this suit to the Eastern District of Texas for possible referral to the bankruptcy court where the related bankruptcy is pending. Because the bankruptcy court is in the best position to determine the scope of its jurisdiction, the Court defers ruling on the motion to remand the state-law claims against the non-bankrupt defendants (Dkt. No.13 ) and denies as moot the motion to stay (Dkt. No.19 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/17/2024) (jdh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
31 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa S Hayward on behalf of Diane Carter, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Steele West Capital Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hayward, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
30 30 NOTICE of Trustee's Comment with respect to Defendant American State Banks Motion for Discretionary Stay and Brief in Support and Defendant American State Banks Motion to Transfer Venue re:19 MOTION to Stay re5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division ,5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Diane Carter, Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Steele West Capital Corporation (Hayward, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
29 29 REPLY filed by American State Bank re:19 MOTION to Stay re5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
28 28 ORDER:Before the Court is American State Bank's unopposed motion for an extension oftime to file its reply in support of its motion for a discretionary stay. Dkt. No.27 . For the reasons stated in the motion, the motion is GRANTED. Any reply filed by April 16,2024, shall be deemed timely. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/11/2024) (jdh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
27 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to19 MOTION to Stay re5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division ,24 Response/Objection, filed by American State Bank (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
26 26 REPLY filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. re:13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
25 25 Appendix in Support filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. re24 Response/Objection, Appendix in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
24 24 RESPONSE filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. re:19 MOTION to Stay re5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
23 23 NOTICE of Joinder re:21 Response/Objection filed by Brandon T. Steele, Steele Bancshares, Inc. (Beck, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Appendix in Support filed by American State Bank re21 Response/Objection - APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN STATE BANK'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND BASED ON MANDATORY ABSTENTION (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
21 21 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by American State Bank re:13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
20 20 REPLY filed by American State Bank re:5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
19 19 MOTION to Stay Defendant American State Bank's Motion For Discretionary Stay and Brief In Support filed by American State Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Bowen, James) Modified text per attorney's office on 3/11/2024 (jdh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 ORDER granting17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Austin Hammer Krist. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/8/2024) (bmh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
17 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Austin Krist (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14443228) filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
16 16 ORDER TO SHOW GROUNDS FOR ADMISSION: The Court is advised by the Clerk of Court that Austin Hammer Krist, whose name appears on a pleading in this case, is not a member of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Accordingly, within 14 days of the date of this Order, Krist must (1) provide satisfactory documentation of Bar membership to the Court and Clerk of Court; (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this Court or for admission pro hac vice for this case; or (3) move to withdraw as counsel in this case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/5/2024) (krr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 ORDER granting11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ben Dillon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/1/2024) (krr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
14 14 RESPONSE filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. re:5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
13 13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Joinder re:5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Brandon T. Steele, Steele Bancshares, Inc. (Beck, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
11 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14426139) filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. (Dillon, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
10 10 ORDER granting9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Grayson L. Linyard terminated. Linyard is relieved of his obligations and duties to this Court as counsel for American State Bank in this case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/27/2024) (bmh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Grayson L. Linyard filed by American State Bank (Linyard, Grayson) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 Plaintiffs' Statement under FRBP 9027(e)(3) filed by Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myrick, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. Attorney Ben Dillon added to parties: Chris Cartwright, Cinde Ebeling, Shannon Ebeling, Steven Ebeling, Donald Ebeling, Jr., Robert Edwards, Ken King, Coy Myrick, Jake Dennis Myric, Rotom, Inc., Daniel Smith, Reeda Smith, Wright-Cart, Ltd. (Dillon, Ben) Modified event type on 2/20/2024 (egp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 ORDER: Case TRANSFERRED to Judge James Wesley Hendrix for further case management. Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 2/8/2024) (krr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
6 6 Appendix in Support filed by American State Bank re5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by American State Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 02, 2024
4 4 NOTICE of Related Case filed by American State Bank (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American State Bank. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by American State Bank. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14364165) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bowen, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/18/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 3 EX 1 - Bankruptcy Filing,
Att: 4 EX 2- Index of Exhibits,
Att: 5 EX 3-Original Petition,
Att: 6 EX 4-Steele & SBI Answer,
Att: 7 EX 5-SWTCC Answer,
Att: 8 EX 6-ASB Answer,
Att: 9 EX 7-1st Amended Petition,
Att: 10 EX 8-SWTCC Motion to Withdraw,
Att: 11 EX 9-ASB Motion to Consolidate,
Att: 12 EX 10-Order Granting SWTCC Motion to Withdraw,
Att: 13 EX 11-Steele & SBI Motion to Substitute Counsel,
Att: 14 EX 12-Order Granting Steele & SBI's Motion to Substitute,
Att: 15 EX 13-Notice of Hearing,
Att: 16 EX 14-Court's Docket Sheet (Cartwright),
Att: 17 EX 15-Certificate of Interested Persons_Disclosure Statement