Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine Henry
Case #: 5:24-cv-02675
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 5:05 AM EST
Defendant
LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By
ALAN S. BATTISTI
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
ALYSSA MICHELLE HICKS
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
JOHN E. FREUND, III
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Saavedra
Represented By
Joseph Montgomery
Montgomery Law Group, PLLC
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2024
OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/23/24. 10/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
GPO Oct 23 2024
ORDER THAT 1. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, SEE ECF NO. 15, IS DISMISSED; 2. DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 16, IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS I-VII; 3. COUNT VIII IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 4. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/23/24. 10/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 03/31 3:33 PM
ORDER THAT THE LETTER BE CONSTRUED AS A MOTION AND THE MOTION WAS GRANTED. THE CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED TO BE HELD IN PERSON ON MARCH 3, 2025, WAS RESCHEDULED TO A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/31/25.3/31/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
37 37 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/18 1:39 PM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/3/25 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 3/18/25. 3/18/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
36 36 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 03/04 2:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY: Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 3/3/25. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/04 11:46 AM
ORDER THAT 1. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY NOVEMBER 3, 2025. 2. ALL EXPERT REPORTS ARE DUE BY JANUARY 15, 2026. 3. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ANY OTHER DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, SHALL BE FILED BY MARCH 2, 2026. RESPONSES TO ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY APRIL 2, 2026. REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY APRIL 16, 2026. 4. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR THE PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. 5. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT TO CHAMBERS BY JULY 3, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/4/25. 3/4/25 ENTERED AND COPIES (er)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/04 10:00 AM
ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE (LYNNE A. SITARSKI). IF THE DISTRICT JUDGE DEEMS REFERRAL APPROPRIATE, A SEPARATE REFERRAL ORDER, SPECIFYING THE REASON FOR REFERRAL, WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 3/4/25. 3/4/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
33 33 discov Discovery Plan Sun 02/23 2:21 PM
Discovery Plan by Alexander Saavedra.(FLYNN, BRADLEY )
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Letter Sun 02/23 10:16 AM
Letter dated 02/23/2025 by Alexander Saavedra. (FLYNN, BRADLEY )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/24 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/3/2025 02:00 PM IN Holmes 4th Floor BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26f Report
Friday, January 10, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/13 6:55 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR TO DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/10/25. 1/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
29 29 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Wed 01/08 2:55 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Rule 16 Conference, scheduled for 1/14/25(er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/11 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 14, 2025, AT 3:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. PLAINTIFF COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL WITH A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL-IN NUMBER AND ACCESS CODE FOR THE CONFERENCE.(dja)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/18 4:15 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, SEE ECF NO. 25, IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/18/24. 11/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/18 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN S. BATTISTI on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE with Certificate of Service(BATTISTI, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
25 25 motion Entry of Default Fri 11/15 4:11 PM
First MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Alexander Saavedra.Entry of Default.(Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Waiver of Service
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Wed 11/13 2:03 PM
Letter dated 11/13/2024 by Alexander Saavedra. (Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/13 9:58 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE.(HICKS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/07 11:27 AM
DEFAULT NOTICE 10 Day Notice Failure of Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 10/23 10:22 AM
ORDER THAT 1. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, SEE ECF NO. 15, IS DISMISSED; 2. DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 16, IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS I-VII; 3. COUNT VIII IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 4. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/23/24. 10/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
20 20 8 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 10/23 10:20 AM
OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/23/24. 10/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/26 8:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by Alexander Saavedra.(Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 12, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/12 4:53 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S LETTER REQUEST, SEE ECF NO. 17, IN WHICH PLAINTIFF SEEKS AN UNOPPOSED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS NOT LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 26, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/12/24. 9/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Thu 09/12 12:26 PM
Letter dated September 12, 2024 by Alexander Saavedra. (Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Mon 09/09 10:53 AM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE.Brief.(HICKS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Thu 09/05 3:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE.Brief.(HICKS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/08 12:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexander Saavedra. LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE waiver sent on 7/8/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/08 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. FREUND, III on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE (FREUND, JOHN)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/08 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSSA MICHELLE HICKS on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE with Certificate of Service(HICKS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Montgomery on behalf of Alexander Saavedra with Certificate of Service(Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/21 10:19 AM
NOTICE by Alexander Saavedra re1 Complaint (Attorney), Designation (Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 06/21 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ALYSSA MICHELLE HICKS on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE(HICKS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 06/21 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOHN E. FREUND, III on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE(FREUND, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. FREUND, III on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE (FREUND, JOHN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSSA MICHELLE HICKS on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE with Certificate of Service(HICKS, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. FREUND, III on behalf of LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE (FREUND, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 06/20 10:32 AM
Summons Issued as to LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 6/20/24 (er)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Thu 06/20 9:38 AM
INITIAL APPEARANCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/20/24. 6/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
2 2 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 06/18 11:51 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Alexander Saavedra as to LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE. (Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 06/18 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against LEHIGH CARBON COMMUNITY COLLEGE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17546584.), filed by Alexander Saavedra.(Montgomery, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 06/18 3:06 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]