New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Rachel P Kovner
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:24-cv-04296
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:51 AM EST
Defendant
Javier Fabian
Defendant
Tortilleria Oaxaca II, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mirna Barboza
Represented By
Paige Irene Piazza
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Lloyd Robert Ambinder
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/26 2:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff has filed a6 "Notice of Discontinuance," which the Court will treat as a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) because no defendant has yet "serve[d] either an answer or a motion for summary judgment." The6 notice of voluntary dismissal is so-ordered, and the action is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 6/26/2024. (BRS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
6 6 notice Notice(Other) Tue 06/25 4:21 PM
NOTICE by Mirna Barboza NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (Ambinder, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 06/18 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Javier Fabian, Tortilleria Oaxaca II, Inc.. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 06/18 2:21 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 06/18 2:20 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/18 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Irene Piazza on behalf of Mirna Barboza (aty to be noticed) (Piazza, Paige)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/18 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Javier Fabian, Tortilleria Oaxaca II, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17988418 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Mirna Barboza. (Ambinder, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/18 2:18 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]