Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11385

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:24-bk-11386
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SDI Stores LLC
160 Corporate Ct
Meriden, CT 06450-7177
Represented By
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/31 8:48 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. for SDI Stores LLC Filed by SDI Stores LLC. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 07/01 5:29 PM
Withdrawal of Claim Nos. 1 (H.H. Brown Shoe Co., Inc.) (webclaimusr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 06/21 12:38 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation andjoint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Mountain Sports LLC (Case No. 24-11385 (MFW));SDI Stores LLC (Case No. 24-11386 (MFW)); SDI Gift Card LLC(Case No. 24-11387 (MFW)); Bobs Store USA LLC (Case No. 24-11388 (MFW));and Mountain Sports USA LLC (Case No. 24-11389 (MFW)). The docket inMountain Sports LLC, Case No. 24-11385 (MFW), should be consulted for allmatters affecting this case. Related [+] Signed on 6/21/2024. (LMC)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 claims Request for Service of Notices Thu 06/20 2:22 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Levin Management Corporation. (Lemkin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Thu 06/20 2:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Bobs Stores USA LLC, Mountain Sports USA, LLC, SDI Gift Card LLC, SDI Stores LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2024 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Thu 06/20 2:02 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bobs Stores USA LLC, Mountain Sports USA, LLC, SDI Gift Card LLC, SDI Stores LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2024 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
3 3 claims Request for Service of Notices Thu 06/20 1:42 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Levin Management Corporation. (Onder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 06/18 5:12 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11386 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11648204, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 06/18 5:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by SDI Stores LLC. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 06/18 6:39 PM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (SH)
Related: [-]