SDI Gift Card LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11385
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11385
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11387 |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
SDI Gift Card LLC
160 Corporate Ct
Meriden, CT 06450-7177 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. for SDI Gift Card LLC Filed by SDI Gift Card LLC. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation andjoint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Mountain Sports LLC (Case No. 24-11385 (MFW));SDI Stores LLC (Case No. 24-11386 (MFW)); SDI Gift Card LLC(Case No. 24-11387 (MFW)); Bobs Store USA LLC (Case No. 24-11388 (MFW));and Mountain Sports USA LLC (Case No. 24-11389 (MFW)). The docket inMountain Sports LLC, Case No. 24-11385 (MFW), should be consulted for allmatters affecting this case. Signed on 6/21/2024. (LMC) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Levin Management Corporation. (Lemkin, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Bobs Stores USA LLC, Mountain Sports USA, LLC, SDI Gift Card LLC, SDI Stores LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2024 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bobs Stores USA LLC, Mountain Sports USA, LLC, SDI Gift Card LLC, SDI Stores LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2024 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Levin Management Corporation. (Onder, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 06/19 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11387 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11649029, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by SDI Gift Card LLC. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 06/18 8:01 PM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (SH) |