Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:24-cv-01472
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 2:40 AM MST
Defendant
Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By
John J Daller
Barrett & Matura PC
contact info
Jennifer Marie Bahling
Barrett & Matura PC
contact info
Kevin Charles Barrett
Barrett & Matura PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Mancera
Represented By
Ariana Byrd
Zinda Law Group PLLC
contact info
David Thomas Panzarella
Lerner & Rowe Law Group - Camelback Rd.
contact info
Brian S Plant
Lerner & Rowe Law Group - Camelback Rd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Terminated: 09/17/2024


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/30 10:23 AM
ORDER that this case will be dismissed with prejudice on May 29, 2025 unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/30/25. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/29 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Staying Case Mon 04/07 9:47 AM
ORDER granting24 Stipulation. This action is stayed pending a final disposition in related case Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. My Fleet LLC et al., Case No. CV 24-02785 PHX-GMS, or until further order of the Court. Within 5 days of the issuance of a ruling in Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. My Fleet LLC et al., Case No. CV 24-02785 PHX-GMS, the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report with this Court. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/4/25. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 11:44 AM
STIPULATION to Stay by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Barrett, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Stay
Friday, November 22, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 11/22 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jonathan Mancera. (Panzarella, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Fri 11/22 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by David Thomas Panzarella. (Panzarella, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 10/18 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jonathan Mancera. (Plant, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 10/08 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Wed 10/02 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Brian S Plant. (Plant, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/26 3:39 PM
RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2025. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/26/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 09/26 3:38 PM
ORDER that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for October 4, 2024, before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/26/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Thu 09/26 9:50 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jonathan Mancera. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 09/24 1:52 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jonathan Mancera. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 09/23 5:30 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jonathan Mancera. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 09/23 5:29 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jonathan Mancera. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Fri 09/20 3:37 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
11 11 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Tue 09/17 9:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to5 Order regarding service time frame required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), and no service completed, Defendants Unknown Parties are terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/17 9:15 AM
ORDER granting9 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that the Case Management Conference presently set for September 20, 2024 is vacated and reset for October 4, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order no later than September 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/16/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 09/16 3:07 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16 Pretrial Conference by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Barrett, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stip to Continue Rule 16 Conference
Friday, August 02, 2024
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 08/02 4:34 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See attached PDF for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/2/24.(MJW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/25 11:48 AM
Auto-Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Barrett, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 service Service Executed Fri 06/21 11:26 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jonathan Mancera: Certificate of Service re: Complaint and Summons served upon Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 05/24/2024. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 06/21 9:04 AM
ORDER - That Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 9/16/24. The Clerk shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on 9/16/24. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/20/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 06/18 5:54 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney must update PACER account to match law firm information on pleading: Ariana Byrd . Law firm name listed on pleading: Lerner & Rowe PC . Law firm in CM-ECF Account: Zinda Law Group PLLC . FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney must update PACER account to match law firm information on pleading: John J Daller . Law firm name listed on pleading: Barrett & Matura PC . Law firm in CM-ECF Account: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP . Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 06/18 5:49 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23161086. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01472 PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/18 5:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (submitted by Kevin Barrett) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 06/18 5:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-011765. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23161086 filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (submitted by Kevin Barrett)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
service Service Executed Tue 06/18 5:48 PM
***State Court record received on 6/18/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jonathan Mancera: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, and Demand for Jury Trial upon Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 5/24/2024.***Certificate of Service by Court Certified Process Server filed in State Court on 5/28/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/18/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK)
Related: [-]