Texas Western District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-00154
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza (1)
Represented By
Alvaro Martinez, Jr.
Martinez Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Mahoney
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/19/2024 3:17 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
Arrest of Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza (je3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin as to Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza. (je3)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Initial Appearance as to Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza held on 6/17/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) ( Detention Hearing set for 7/2/2024 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge Ronald C. Griffin,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza (Court Reporter FTR Midland.) (je3)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Alvaro Martinez, Jr for Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza appointed. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza. (je3)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 7/2/2024 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Adrian Huerta-Hinostroza. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]