Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-01729
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon Quiroz-Guerra (1)
Represented By
Michael J Bagley
The Bagley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 06/19/2024 3:21 AM CDT
Saturday, June 15, 2024
Arrest of Brandon Quiroz-Guerra (drda)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Brandon Quiroz-Guerra. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Brandon Quiroz-Guerra. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Brandon Quiroz-Guerra. (drda)
Related: [-]