Utah District Court
Judge:Dale A Kimball
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 2:24-cv-00440
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2024 1:28 AM MST
Defendant
TomoCredit, Inc.
Plaintiff
I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing
Represented By
Daniel L. Steele
Sumsion Steele & Crandall
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/14 9:56 AM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. This action is closed. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/14/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Thu 11/14 8:58 AM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing.(Steele, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/24 1:19 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 13 Amended Ex-Parte Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Answer Until December 22, 2024 to Allow Defendant to Perform Under Settlement Agreement. Defendant TomoCredit Inc. shall have until December 22, 2024 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/24/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 09/23 4:56 PM
STATUS REPORT by I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. (Steele, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/17 11:56 AM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer Until December 22,2024 to Allow Defendant to Perform Under Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Steele, Daniel) Modified by changing event type to motion for extension of time to file answer on 9/17/2024 (eat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/16 1:48 PM
ORDER granting 9 Ex-Parte Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Answer. Defendant TomoCredit Inc. shall have until December 22, 2024 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. Upon written notice from Plaintiff to Defendant that it considers Defendant to be in breach of the Addendum and/or Settlement Agreement and without further involvement of the Court, TomoCredit shall have 21 days from the date of such notice to file an Answer in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/16/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
misc Modification of Docket Mon 09/16 9:30 AM
Modification of Docket: re10 ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER UNTIL DECEMBER 22, 2024 TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PERFORM UNDER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Plaintiff filed the document as another motion for extension of time rather than as an errata. The clerk has terminated the second motion and corrected the docket text. No further action is required of the filer at this time. (eat)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/13 9:38 PM
Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER UNTIL DECEMBER 22, 2024 TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PERFORM UNDER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Plaintiff I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Steele, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 09, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/09 8:12 PM
Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Until December 22, 2024 to Allow Defendant to Perform Under Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Steele, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Status Report Order Mon 09/09 12:14 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a report as to the status of this case by 9/23/24. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/9/2024. (awm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/10 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. Summons served on TomoCredit, Inc., on 6/27/2024. (Steele, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 06/25 9:17 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/25/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/24 4:14 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/24/2024. (eat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 06/20 9:06 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to TomoCredit, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 06/20 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 7/11/2024. (kec)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/20 9:03 AM
Judge Dale A. Kimball added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00440-DAK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Thu 06/20 11:04 AM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Atty) Wed 06/19 6:33 PM
COMPLAINT against TomoCredit, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5098792) filed by I.C. Security Printers, Inc. - Marketing. (Steele, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet