Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-02110
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 20, 2024 1:05 AM MST
Defendant
Santos Macario Aguilar-Ramos (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/20/2024 2:34 AM MST
Saturday, June 15, 2024
Arrest of Santos Macario Aguilar-Ramos on 6/15/2024. (CXE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Santos Macario Aguilar-Ramos. (CXE)
Related: [-]