New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00398
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 20, 2024 3:27 AM EDT
Defendant
ARON PURETZ (1)
Represented By
STEVEN Y. YUROWITZ
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
BABASIJIBOMI MOORE
contact info

GPO Jun 17 2024
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ARON PURETZ (1) $100,000.00 with special conditions (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 06/17/2024. (pdm)

Docket last updated: 02/24/2025 5:38 PM EST
Monday, June 17, 2024
1 1 14 pgs INFORMATION as to ARON PURETZ (1) count 1. (pdm)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by ARON PURETZ (pdm)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Kirsch: Initial Appearance , Bond Hearing and Plea Agreement Hearing as to ARON PURETZ held on 6/17/2024. Guilty Plea entered by ARON PURETZ (1) as to Count 1. Sentencing set for 10/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Robert Kirsch. Bail set at $100,000 unsecured appearance bond with special conditions. Defendant released. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carol Farrell (856-318-6100).) (pdm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/25/2024) (pdm, ).
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: STEVEN Y. YUROWITZ appearing for ARON PURETZ. (pdm)
Related: [-]
5 5 8 pgs APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to ARON PURETZ. (pdm)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to ARON PURETZ (pdm)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ARON PURETZ (1) $100,000.00 with special conditions (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 06/17/2024. (pdm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/25/2024) (pdm, ).
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs Non-Surety Bond Entered as to ARON PURETZ in amount of $100,000.00.(pdm)
Related: [-]