California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:24-cv-01058
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201fl FLSA: Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA)
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2024 12:17 AM PST
Defendant
San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc.
Represented By
Steven E Boehmer
Mcdougal, Love, Eckis, Boehmer & Foley
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose De La Cerda
Represented By
Lauren Nicole Vega
Ferraro Vega Employment Lawyers, Inc.
contact info
Nicholas J. Ferraro
Ferraro Vega Employment Lawyers, Inc.
contact info

GPO Dec 10 2024
ORDER Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings [Doc. No. 4]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/10/2024. (anh)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 02/06 12:29 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Stay Action [Doc. No.13 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/6/2025. (anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 motion Stay Wed 02/05 5:21 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending Mediation by Jose De La Cerda. (Ferraro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Joint Discovery Plan Wed 02/05 4:27 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc. (Boehmer, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/05 11:05 AM
ORDER Regarding Compliance with the Court's January 7, 2025 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 2/5/2025.(anh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elyssa Martinez on behalf of Jose De La Cerda (Martinez, Elyssa)Attorney Elyssa Martinez added to party Jose De La Cerda(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
9 9 7 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 01/07 10:05 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/7/2025.(anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/03 5:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc..(Boehmer, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 12/10 11:43 AM
ORDER Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings [Doc. No.4 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/10/2024. (anh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
6 6 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/16 3:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc.. (Boehmer, Steven) (anh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/09 2:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Jose De La Cerda.(Ferraro, Nicholas) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jose De La Cerda in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 motion Compel Mon 08/19 4:24 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc..(Boehmer, Steven)Attorney Steven E Boehmer added to party San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant, San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Steven E. Boehmer in Support of Defendant, San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/17 8:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jose De La Cerda, as to San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc.. (Ferraro, Nicholas) (anh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/20 9:13 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/20 9:08 AM
COMPLAINT against San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18947532.), filed by Jose De La Cerda. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1058-CAB-DDL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Ferraro, Nicholas)(ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's FLSA Consent to Join Form