Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-16185

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:24-bk-16214
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC
80 W Century Rd
Paramus, NJ 07652-1437
Represented By
Douglas J. McGill
Webber Mcgill LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 02/12 6:21 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 01, 2025
20 20 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 01/01 10:08 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
19 19 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 01/01 10:07 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 01/01 10:06 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, November 15, 2024
court Notice of Docketing Error Fri 11/15 4:57 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: Creditors not uploaded, filed by Douglas J McGill. Please correct and refile with the court. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC
Thursday, November 14, 2024
17 17 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Thu 11/14 8:29 AM
Amended Schedule(s) : E/F Fee Amount $ 34 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Thu 11/14 8:37 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)([LINK 24-16214 VFP] ) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47471909, fee amount $ 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#17
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 11/07 12:05 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2024 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, September 20, 2024
15 15 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 09/20 1:21 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-16185 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2024 filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 08/10 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 08/07 3:40 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) and Waiving Requirements of 11 U.S.C. § 342(c)(l) and Bankruptcy Rule 2002(n) Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/7/2024. (jf)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-16185 24-16214 24-16216 24-16219 24-16221 24-16223 Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Wed 08/07 12:46 PM
Status Conference Hearing rescheduled to September 12, 2024, (See Lead Case) Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing for: General Status Conference. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/18/2024. filed by Debtor Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney and US Trustee.
Friday, August 02, 2024
utility Case Association Mon 08/05 9:46 AM
Create Case Association Between Lead Case 24-16185 and Member Case 24-16219 24-16214 24-16216 24-16221 (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Tue 07/23 11:36 AM
Remar Related [+]. No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (mlc)
Related: [-] 12 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC
court Hearing Held Tue 07/23 4:27 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders and Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G and H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.
Monday, July 22, 2024
12 12 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Mon 07/22 3:30 PM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 motion Joint Administration Thu 07/18 5:19 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-16185 24-16214 24-16216 24-16219 24-16221 24-16223 Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Thu 07/18 10:46 AM
Remar Related [+]. STILL MISSING: Atty Disclosure Statement (mlc)
Related: [-] 10 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Wed 07/17 3:16 PM
Missing Document(s): Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 14, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 07/15 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Fri 07/12 2:47 PM
Notice of Hearing for: General Status Conference. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/18/2024. filed by Debtor Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 misc Document Wed 07/10 11:19 AM
Document re: Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 30, 2024
6 6 4 pgs court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Mon 07/01 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 06/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 29, 2024
5 5 3 pgs court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 06/30 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
4 4 2 pgs court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 06/28 7:49 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/18/2024 at 12:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 8/29/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/17/2024. (rah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Show Cause Thu 06/27 3:27 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders and Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G and H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (eag)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
utility Remark Fri 06/21 3:30 PM
Debtor's Principal Place of Business is 1100 Edgewood Avenue, Trenton, NJ 08618. (eag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned Thu 06/20 2:08 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Vincent F. Papalia added to the case as Petition Lists 24-15167 24-15881 24-15883 and 24-16185 as Associated Cases. (rah)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 06/20 2:04 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Edgewood Commons Trenton Proud LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/18/2024. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Thu 06/20 2:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-16214 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46901636, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1