New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-04376
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.
Represented By
Kevin John Lennon
Lennon Murphy & Phillips, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Danaos Shipping Co. LTD
Represented By
Kevin John Lennon
Lennon Murphy & Phillips, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammed Saleh Saad
Represented By
Jared Lacertosa
Weitz & Luxenberg P.C.
contact info
Meredith Abrams
Weitz And Luxenberg
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Danaos Corporation
Terminated: 09/24/2024


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
38 38 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/27 5:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re37 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Leave to File Document Thu 02/27 1:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Abrams, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
36 36 12 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 02/21 5:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 02/21 4:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/21 4:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Danaos Initial Email to TFMarine,
Att: 2 Exhibit TFMarine Request for Saad Parole,
Att: 3 Exhibit TFMarine Supplemental Request for Saad Parole,
Att: 4 Exhibit CBP Medical Parole for Saad,
Att: 5 Exhibit Communications between CBP, TFMarine and IMC Medical Mariner Management,
Att: 6 Exhibit TFMarine April 6, 2023 Email to CBP,
Att: 7 Exhibit TFMarine April 7, 2023 Email to CBP,
Att: 8 Exhibit TFMarine April 8, 2023 Email to CBP,
Att: 9 Exhibit TFMarine April 10, 2023 Email to CBP,
Att: 10 Exhibit Danaos Email to TFMarine re Seamans Book and Passport,
Att: 11 Exhibit CBP Confirmation of Receipt of Seamans Book and Passport
33 33 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 02/21 4:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/21 4:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Master's Email dated March 9, 2023,
Att: 2 Exhibit Crew Department Email dated March 10, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit Master's Email dated March 10, 2023,
Att: 4 Exhibit Express Athens Medical Log Book,
Att: 5 Exhibit Express Athens Logbook
31 31 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 02/21 4:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Saad Employment Applications,
Att: 2 Exhibit Saad Letter to ITF,
Att: 3 Exhibit Sky Nurses Fit to Fly Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Email String
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/04 1:58 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time -- For good cause shown, the Court grants Defendants' unopposed request for an extension of their deadline to file a reply in further support of their motion to dismiss. Accordingly, Defendants shall file such reply by February 21, 2025 . SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 2/4/2025. (CC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/03 1:32 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,17 MOTION to Dismiss by Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
29 29 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/10 2:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss George Theocharidis filed by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/10 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Declaration filed by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/10 2:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bayonne Hosp Records,
Att: 2 Exhibit EMS Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit Jamaica Hosp Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit Express Athens Data
26 26 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Fri 01/10 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Abrams on behalf of Mohammed Saleh Saad (notification declined or already on case) (Abrams, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/13 10:34 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/13 12:32 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time -- Plaintiff timely filed an unopposed request for an extension of his deadline to file opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss until January 10, 2025. See , Dkt. Entry No.23 . Defendants consent to the application provided their deadline to file reply papers is extended until February 10, 2025. See , Dkt. Entry No.24 . The parties' requests are granted. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his responsive papers by January 10, 2025 , and Defendants shall file any reply by February 10, 2025 . SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/13/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/13 3:34 PM
ORDER: The Motion of Meredith Abrams for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice22 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, if needed; registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that the attorney receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $200 admission fee is submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 12/13/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/12 2:52 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 2:02 PM
First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18576669 by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Abrams, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 11/19 3:15 PM
ORDER re21 Joint Motion for Extension of Time --- The parties' proposed modification to the briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss is approved, albeit reluctantly. The parties' request violates this Court's Individual Rules Section II(D) requiring that such requests be made at least three business days prior to the deadline, not on the date of the deadline. Moreover, the application must be made by MOTION explaining why the extension is required, not as a stipulation by the parties as a fait accompli on the assumption that the Court is just a rubber stamp. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his responsive papers by December 17, 2024, and Defendants shall file their reply by January 7, 2025. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/19/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
21 21 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 11/18 2:59 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Stipulation to adjourn Motion by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 11/05 4:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 11/05 4:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
18 18 25 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 11/05 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Tue 11/05 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp.. (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
order Order(Other) Tue 09/24 4:19 PM
ORDER: The Court interprets the parties stipulation14 as a consent motion for an extension of time for Defendants to answer the Amended Complaint. The Court grants the request and Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by 11/05/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 9/24/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin John Lennon on behalf of Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Shipping Co. LTD (aty to be noticed) (Lennon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/06 3:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Fri 09/06 3:02 PM
STIPULATION of Discontinuance and Service by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
13 13 service Summons Reissued Wed 07/03 3:51 PM
Summons Reissued as to Danaos Corporation, Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Mohammed Saleh Saad. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/02 2:16 PM
Proposed Summons. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/02 9:41 AM
Proposed Summons. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/02 9:39 AM
Proposed Summons. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/02 9:38 AM
Proposed Summons. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
Att: 1 Alt address for service-Danaos Corp.
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/27 3:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Cellcontainer (No.8) Corp., Danaos Corporation, Danaos Shipping Co. LTD. (MLR)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 06/27 12:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Danaos Corporation, Danaos Shipping Co. LTD, Mohammed Saleh Saad. (MLR)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/27 10:46 AM
Proposed Summons. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 06/26 9:51 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 06/26 9:41 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/26 9:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 06/26 9:54 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: 1) No name and address on the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section. 2)If multiple defendants, there must be a rider attached to the one (1)Proposed summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. Do not file a separate proposed summons for each defendant. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/21 12:31 PM
Proposed Summons. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/21 12:30 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Mohammed Saleh Saad (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/21 7:15 AM
NOTICE! Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/20 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17995548 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Mohammed Saleh Saad. (Lacertosa, Jared)
Related: [-]