New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:24-cv-04387
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Adara Skin Care Corp.
Represented By
Diana Y. Seo
Seo Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Jiaxin Na
Seo Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Marion Becerra
Represented By
Diana Y. Seo
Seo Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Jiaxin Na
Seo Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Joseph DiBenedetto
JDB Mediation, LLC 380 Rector Place
New York, NY 10280
Plaintiff
Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay
Represented By
Avraham Y. Scher
Joseph & Norinsberg, LLC
contact info
James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
contact info
Roman M. Avshalumov
Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Katelyn Marie Schillaci
Helen F. Dalton & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/30 1:40 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time25 is granted. All discovery must be completed by 6/19/2025 . The final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 7/21/2025 . In light of the foregoing, the motion for extension of time24 is denied as moot. So Ordered by Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/30/2025. (YEP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/21 6:38 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to set the deadline to complete discovery as June 19, 2025, and set the deadline to take the first step in dispositive motion practice as July 19, 2025 by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (Na, Jiaxin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/19 1:43 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (Na, Jiaxin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 3:35 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 10/16 12:29 PM
REPORT of Mediation Unsettled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 10/30/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jiaxin Na on behalf of Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra (aty to be noticed) (Na, Jiaxin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/03 7:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (Seo, Diana)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/03 7:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra (Seo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
20 20 adr Selection of Mediator Tue 08/27 10:08 AM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Joseph DiBenedetto selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote:October 14, 2024, 10:00 a.m. via Zoom Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
order Order(Other) Fri 08/23 3:39 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' consent to Judge Bulsara's jurisdiction for all purposes19 , the Court readopts and reinstates the deadlines from the Scheduling Order dated August 21, 2024. Those deadlines include: Any amendment of the pleadings to add claims or join additional parties shall be completed by 11/6/2024 ; all fact discovery shall be completed by 3/21/2025 ; and the final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 4/21/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/23/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 08/22 9:30 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Hector Gonzalez no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/21 9:52 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (Seo, Diana)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Status Report Order Wed 08/21 5:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case has been reassigned to Judge Gonzalez and is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Bulsara for pretrial purposes. Accordingly, the Court vacates the previously ordered case management plan in this action. See ECF Aug. 21, 2024, Scheduling Order. However, the Order referring the case to mediation remains in effect. Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by September 4, 2024, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Given the amount of time this action has already been pending, the Court expects the parties' case management plan to provide for: (i) the completion of fact discovery on or before November 19, 2024, and (ii) the completion of any expert discovery on or before January 20, 2025. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. The Court will not adjourn the deadline for filing the joint letter and proposed case management plan absent exceptional circumstances. The parties are warned that the Court expects them to pursue their discovery obligations concurrently with their mediation efforts. The Court will not extend the deadlines it sets for the parties to complete discovery because the parties have been pursuing mediation. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 8/21/2024. (RCM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/21 11:08 AM
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer15 is granted. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 9/3/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/21/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order Wed 08/21 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 8/22/2024 is hereby adjourned sine die . The Court adopts the deadlines in the parties' proposed scheduling order16 , except as otherwise stated, and those deadlines include: Any amendment of the pleadings to add claims or join additional parties shall be completed by 11/6/2024 ; all fact discovery shall be completed by 3/21/2025 ; and the final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 4/21/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/21/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 08/21 11:18 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation: The parties have expressed a desire to reach an amicable resolution of this case, this case is referred to the EDNY Mediation Panel. For assistance with any questions about the mediation process or the selection of a mediator, counsel are invited to contact EDNY ADR Administrator Danielle Shalov at (718) 613-2578. The mediation shall be completed by 10/21/2024 . Selection of Mediator due by 9/4/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/21/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Wed 08/21 1:13 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Counsel are to select a mediator, contact the mediator to schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place (in-person or remote) of the first mediation session using the Selection of the Mediator Form on the ADR Forms website under Mediator Forms/For Counsel and Parties: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms or via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators, their qualifications and contact information, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1). The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (DS)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Wed 08/21 4:45 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign a District Judge to this case. (EM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/21 4:54 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned as presider to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (DA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 08/19 5:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (O'Donnell, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 08/19 5:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint for the Second Time to File Defendants' Response by September 3, 2024 by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (Seo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/02 3:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 8/22/2024 in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara at 225 Cadman Plaza, East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel for all parties must be present. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 8/19/2024 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/2/2024. (EM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/24 3:52 PM
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer13 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 8/19/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/24/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/19 7:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (Seo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint
Thursday, July 18, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/18 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Y. Seo on behalf of Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra (aty to be noticed) (Seo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/15 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay. Marion Becerra served on 7/10/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/08 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay. Adara Skin Care Corp. served on 6/28/2024, answer due 7/19/2024. (Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
9 9 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 06/21 9:55 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 06/21 9:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra. (CV)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 06/21 9:53 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn Marie Schillaci on behalf of Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay (aty to be noticed) (Schillaci, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Avraham Y. Scher on behalf of Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay (aty to be noticed) (Scher, Avraham)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay (aty to be noticed) (O'Donnell, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/20 5:04 PM
Proposed Summons. Re2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet,1 Complaint by Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay (Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/20 5:04 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay (Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/20 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Adara Skin Care Corp., Marion Becerra filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17996264 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Liliana Fabiola Munoz Guichay. (Avshalumov, Roman)
Related: [-]