Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:24-bk-31811
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jan 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PRO CIV CONSTRUCTION, LLC
3010 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy Ste 1230
Dallas, TX 75234-7770
Represented By
Eric Thomas Haitz
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
court Close adversary case Mon 04/14 3:55 PM
Adversary case 3:24-ap-3100 closed (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
211 211 order Compensation Tue 04/08 2:01 PM
Order granting first and final application for compensation Related [+] granting for Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones, LLP, fees awarded: $112262.50, expenses awarded: $4455.01 Entered on 4/8/2025. (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 201