Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Ridgway
Case #: 3:24-bk-31617
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024

Debtor
GROTTO GROUP OF ST. PAUL LLC
29 SOUTH DEEP LAKE ROAD
NORTH OAKS, MN 55127
Represented By
John D. Lamey, III
Lamey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Mary Jo A Jensen-Carter
Buckley & Jensen 1257 Gun Club Road
White Bear Lake, MN 55110
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415


Docket last updated: 06/21/2024 12:06 AM CDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 06/20 4:48 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 24-31617 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13464209. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc Add creditor to matrix Thu 06/20 4:45 PM
List of Creditors load 29 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Thu 06/20 4:38 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals re: GROTTO GROUP OF ST. PAUL LLC. Fee Amount $338.00. Incomplete Filings due by 07/8/2024. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Responsibilities of Chapter 7 Debtors and Their Attorneys Thu 06/20 4:38 PM
Notice of Responsibilities of Chapter 7 Debtors and Their Attorneys. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 06/20 4:38 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] filed by GROTTO GROUP OF ST. PAUL LLC. There is no parent corporation or publicly held corporation to report for GROTTO GROUP OF ST. PAUL LLC. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-] 1