Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas L Saladino
Case #: 4:24-bk-40561
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Dec 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
DEJ Grading, LLC
531 Sunset Dr
Yutan, NE 68073-5065
Represented By
Lauren R. Goodman
Mcgrath North Mullin & Kratz, Pc Llo
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Jerry L. Jensen
Acting United States Trustee Roman L. Hruska U.S. Trustee 111 S. 18th Plaza, Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Monday, December 30, 2024
96 96 order Fees & Expenses Mon 12/30 10:13 AM
Order Approving Interim Application of Subchapter V Trustee for (I) Allowance of Compensation and (II) Authorization to Apply Funds Received to Allowed Fees and Costs Related [+]. Approving for Donald L. Swanson, fees awarded: $6295.50, expenses awarded: $11.10. The motion is approved. The motion was properly noticed and served as required by the Local Rules. No objection or resistance was timely filed. The movant must serve notice of this order on all parties in interest affected by the motion or order who did not receive notice via the CM/ECF system, and if any parties were served, the movant must file a certificate of service. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text Only Order) (dkk)
Related: [-] 92
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
95 95 notice Certificate of Service Tue 12/24 11:25 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor DEJ Grading, LLC Related [+] (Goodman, Lauren)
Related: [-] 93 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan