Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-02331
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 2:35 AM CST
Defendant
Regency Ancillaries Support LLC
Represented By
Diane B. Maughan
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
James F. Henry
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Randel Andrew Patty, II
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Regency IHS Home Care Services LLC
Represented By
Diane B. Maughan
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
James F. Henry
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Randel Andrew Patty, II
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Regency IHS Hospice Services, LLC
Represented By
Diane B. Maughan
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
James F. Henry
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Randel Andrew Patty, II
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Astellas Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Wolkoff
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Shima S Roy
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Eryn Terry
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Nicholas O Kennedy
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Astellas USA LLC
Represented By
Joshua Wolkoff
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Shima S Roy
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Eryn Terry
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Nicholas O Kennedy
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/21/2024 12:41 AM CDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
1 1 21 pgs COMPLAINT against Regency Ancillaries Support LLC, Regency IHS Home Care Services LLC, Regency IHS Hospice Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31792051) filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas USA LLC. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Regency Ancillaries Support LLC, Regency IHS Home Care Services LLC, Regency IHS Hospice Services, LLC, filed. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE Related [+] by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas USA LLC, filed. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-] port on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark
4 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas USA LLC identifying Astellas US Holding, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed. (Kennedy, Nicholas)
Related: [-]