Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:24-bk-23041
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Power Block Coin, LLC
1145 S 800 E Ste 117
Orem, UT 84097-7254
Represented By
Darren B. Neilson
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Alexander S Chang
contact info
Simeon J Brown
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Brian M. Rothschild
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Last checked: Monday Jul 01, 2024 9:13 AM MDT
Financial Advisor
CFO Solutions, LLC dba Amplo
13601 W McMillan Rd #102 PMB 320
Boise, ID 83713
Trustee
Joli A. Lofstedt
Joli A. Lofstedt,Trustee PO Box 270561
Louisville, CO 80027
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bank Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Matthew James Burne
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Peter J. Kuhn
Us Trustees Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:01 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
325 325 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Wed 05/21 10:22 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 30, 2025 Filed by Power Block Coin, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Hillcrest Bank Statement
Att: 2 Supplement Hillcrest Bank Reconciliation
Att: 3 Supplement Power Block Coin Income Statement
Att: 4 Supplement Power Block Coin Balance Sheet
Att: 5 Supplement Power Block Coin Cash Receipts and Disbursements
Att: 6 Supplement Power Block Coin Note Receivables Summary
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
324 324 notice *Notice of Hearing(Amended/Rescheduled/Continued) Tue 05/20 11:46 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by Power Block Coin, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2025 at 02:00 PM at ZoomGov.com/join - JTM: Meeting ID: 161 5478 8875, Passcode: 3834658, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 6/3/2025. (Rothschild, Brian)
Related: [-] 302 Application for Compensation
Friday, May 16, 2025
323 323 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/16 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Heninger, Carson)
Related: [-] 322 Amended Notice of Hearing
322 322 notice *Notice of Hearing(Amended/Rescheduled/Continued) Fri 05/16 11:42 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+] NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION OF THE COMMITTEE FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) APPROVING ADEQUACY OF DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, (II) APPROVING SOLICITATION AND NOTICE PROCEDURES FOR CONFIRMATION OF THE COMMITTEES PLAN, (III) APPROVING BALLOT AND NOTICE FORMS IN CONNECTION THEREWITH, (IV) SCHEDULING CERTAIN DATES WITH RESPECT THERETO, AND (V) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2025 at 02:00 PM at ZoomGov.com/join - JTM: Meeting ID: 161 5478 8875, Passcode: 3834658, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 6/3/2025. (Heninger, Carson)
Related: [-] 277 Motion to Approve Adequacy of Disclosure Statement
court Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (Chambers) Fri 05/16 3:39 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Re:299 Motion for Relief From Stay. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2025 at 02:00 PM at ZoomGov.com/join - JTM: Meeting ID: 161 5478 8875, Passcode: 3834658, Phone 1-669-254-5252. (msc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
321 321 answer Objection Wed 05/14 9:29 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Thomson, Michael)
Related: [-] 299 Motion for Relief From Stay