Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20258
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 21, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Philip Samuel Marsh (1)
Represented By
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Alexandra Ann Hoffman
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Abbie D. Waxman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/21/2024 3:31 AM EDT
Saturday, June 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Philip Samuel Marsh (1). (kan) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Philip Samuel Marsh held on 6/3/2024. Bond recommendation/set: Philip Samuel Marsh (1) Defendant held Temporary PTD at government request. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 6/3/2024. Arraignment set for 6/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Pretrial Detention Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 6/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for Philip Samuel Marsh (Digital 13:53:50) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/3/2024. (fbn) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
3 3 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Philip Samuel Marsh (Hoffman, Alexandra) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexandra Ann Hoffman appearing for Philip Samuel Marsh . Attorney Alexandra Ann Hoffman added to party Philip Samuel Marsh(pty:dft). (Hoffman, Alexandra) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Philip Samuel Marsh(Waxman, Abbie) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
6 6 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Detention Hearing as to Philip Samuel Marsh held on 6/6/2024. Pretrial Detention Hearing Held. FBI S/A Thomas Pavletic sworn and testified. The Court grants Government request for Pretrial Detention based on danger to the community. (Digital 13:55:15; 13:57:14) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/6/2024. (ogn1) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Philip Samuel Marsh. Responses due by 6/28/2024. (Waxman, Abbie) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION Pretrial Detention by USA as to Philip Samuel Marsh. Responses due by 6/28/2024. (Waxman, Abbie) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Status Conference RE: Prelim/Arraignment as to Philip Samuel Marsh held on 6/17/2024 ; Government's7 Motion to Continue Arraignment to 6/20/24 is GRANTED. (Arraignment and Preliminary Examination reset for 6/20/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.) (Digital 10:20:11 / 10:25:17) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis (kan) [1:24-mj-03060-EGT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT as to Philip Samuel Marsh (1) count(s) 1, 2 and FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (kan) (kan).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/20/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment