Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:24-cv-01498
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:0002(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Terminated:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2024 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
ATP Flight Academy of Arizona, LLC
8825 N 23rd Ave. Ste 100
Phoenix, AZ 85021
Represented By
Thomas E. Scott, Jr.
Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA
contact info
Juan Franco
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
George Donovan Conwell, Jr.
Conwell Business Law, PA
contact info
Rachel Kate Beige
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
ATP Flight Academy, LLC
1555 The Greens Way
Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250
Represented By
Thomas E. Scott, Jr.
Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA
contact info
Juan Franco
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
George Donovan Conwell, Jr.
Conwell Business Law, PA
contact info
Rachel Kate Beige
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
ATP USA, Inc.
2 Sun Court Ste 400
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092
Represented By
Thomas E. Scott, Jr.
Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA
contact info
Juan Franco
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
George Donovan Conwell, Jr.
Conwell Business Law, PA
contact info
Rachel Kate Beige
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn McMinn
Represented By
Emily Jean Sullivan
Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC
contact info
Karen Kithan Yau
Getman Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC
contact info
William John Gadd
Updean Burnetti Law
contact info
Whitney F. Flanagan
Getman Sweeney & Dunn
contact info
Plaintiff
Corey Jackson
Represented By
Emily Jean Sullivan
Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC
contact info
Karen Kithan Yau
Getman Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC
contact info
William John Gadd
Updean Burnetti Law
contact info
Whitney F. Flanagan
Getman Sweeney & Dunn
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Young
Represented By
Emily Jean Sullivan
Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC
contact info
Karen Kithan Yau
Getman Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC
contact info
William John Gadd
Updean Burnetti Law
contact info
Whitney F. Flanagan
Getman Sweeney & Dunn
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, October 31, 2024
88 88 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Thu 10/31 10:06 AM
ORDER: "Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration" (Doc. 50 ) is granted to the extent the Court finds that Defendants may enforce the arbitration agreements in this case. The motion is denied to the extent that Plaintiffs' claims are not subject to dismissal at this time. This case is stayed pending the completion of arbitration, and the parties are directed to notify the Court within (14) days of the resolution of the arbitration proceedings. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/31/2024. (ANL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 10/31 4:07 PM
Case Stayed. (ABM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
87 87 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/28 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young(Yau, Karen) (Modified on 10/28/2024, to edit text) (BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Consents to Sue
Friday, October 25, 2024
86 86 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Fri 10/25 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re:6 Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for Consideration of the Inexpensive Determination, Efficient, and Abbreviated Litigation (IDEAL) Program (IDEAL Referral Order). The IDEAL case management conference is hereby rescheduled for November 12, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite via Zoom videoconference. The parties should review the IDEAL Referral Order in advance of the hearing and be prepared to discuss any procedures that they believe could streamline discovery, motions practice, and trial. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom videoconference invitation by separate email. Each person who participates in the proceeding must attend using his or her own device so that he or she appears on a separate screen during the videoconference.(ACL)
Related: [-]
85 85 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/25 3:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 84 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference. The Court will re-set the case management conference by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 10/25/2024. (ACL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
84 84 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 7:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically reschedule case management conference by ATP Flight Academy of Arizona, LLC, ATP Flight Academy, LLC, ATP USA, Inc.. (Conwell, George)
Related: [-]
83 83 misc Declaration Thu 10/24 6:21 PM
DECLARATION of Jonathan Yonke re78 Response in Opposition to Motion by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young.(Yau, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-ATP Handbook,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-ATP Paystub
82 82 misc Declaration Thu 10/24 6:18 PM
DECLARATION of Ryan Ross re78 Response in Opposition to Motion by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young.(Yau, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-ATP Handbook,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-ATP Fee schedule
81 81 misc Declaration Thu 10/24 6:15 PM
DECLARATION of Isaac Parks re78 Response in Opposition to Motion by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young.(Yau, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-ATP Handbook
80 80 misc Declaration Thu 10/24 6:12 PM
DECLARATION of Shawn McMinn re78 Response in Opposition to Motion by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young.(Yau, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-ATP Handbook,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-ATP Pay Summary 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-ATP Fee schedule
79 79 misc Declaration Thu 10/24 6:10 PM
DECLARATION of Karen Kithan Yau re78 Response in Opposition to Motion by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young.(Yau, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Directory of Flight Training School Locations _ ATP Flight School,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Airline Career Pilot Program _ ATP Flight School,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Fixed Cost Pricing _ ATP Flight School,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Aircraft Maintenance Centers _ ATP Flight School,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Airline Pilot Hiring Partnerships _ ATP Flight School,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Black's Law Dictionary, 2nd Edition (1910)
78 78 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/24 6:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Compel Arbitration filed by Corey Jackson, Shawn McMinn, Justin Young. (Yau, Karen)
Related: [-]