Original Case: 4:23-cr-00061

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cr-02257
Typecriminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 7:06 PM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
Zachary James Flaherty
Represented By
Frederic Montgomery Brown
F.M. BROWN LAW FIRM
contact info
Zachary James Flaherty
POLK COUNTY JAIL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Craig Peyton Gaumer
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Kyle J. Essley
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/04/2024 7:06 PM CDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
***LOCKED DOCUMENT*** APPEARANCE filed by F. Montgomery Brown for Appellant Zachary James Flaherty w/service 06/20/2024 [5405306] 24-2257 --[Edited 06/27/2024 by DNS] Document missing signature. Refer to docket ID no. 5405379. (FMB)
Related: [-]
5 pgs CRIMINAL case docketed. [5405266] 24-2257 (CAH)
Related: [-]
23 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, R&R 11/29/23, order 12/28/23, judgment 6/12/24. [5405268] 24-2257 (CAH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER:Appointing F. Montgomery Brown for Zachary James Flaherty under the Criminal Justice Act. [5405270] 24-2257 (CAH)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 07/11/2024. Transcript due 07/11/2024. Brief of appellant Zachary James Flaherty due 07/25/2024. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5405272] 24-2257 (CAH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by F. Montgomery Brown for Appellant Zachary James Flaherty w/service 06/20/2024 [5405379] 24-2257 (FMB)
Related: [-]