Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-11624
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Case in other court:Wayne County Circuit Court, 24-007896-NO
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:21 AM EST
Defendant
Signature Flight Support LLC
Represented By
Scott R. Torpey
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Timothy James O'Connell
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Beth Morrison
Represented By
Nichole Ann Omilion
Marko Law
contact info
Tyler M. Joseph
Marko Law, PLLC
contact info
Jonathan R. Marko
Marko Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
16 16 order Protective Order Thu 04/10 12:28 PM
Stipulated Confidentiality PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Independent Medical Examination with Steven Simensky, M.D. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Protective Order Thu 04/10 12:13 PM
Stipulated Confidentiality PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Independent Medical Examination with Jad G. Khalil. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 trial Witness List Mon 03/17 4:41 PM
WITNESS LIST by Signature Flight Support LLC (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
13 13 trial Witness List Mon 03/17 2:20 PM
Plaintiff's Lay WITNESS LIST by Beth Morrison (Omilion, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Fri 09/13 10:57 AM
[STRICKEN - DISCOVERY] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beth Morrison Plaintiff's Responses to Discovery (Omilion, Nichole) Modified on 9/13/2024 (EVra)
Related: [-]
notice Error Fri 09/13 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Nichole Ann Omilion re12 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (EVra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
11 11 notice Appear* Wed 09/11 1:06 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 8/28/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Robert J. White. Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (Villereal, Tara)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/11 1:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/16/2025; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/26/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2026 at 2:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 2/3/2026 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Robert J. White Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. Related [+] (Villereal, Tara)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
9 9 notice Notice - Other Wed 09/11 9:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS (Villereal, Tara)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 09/11 9:48 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Villereal, Tara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 09/04 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James O'Connell on behalf of Signature Flight Support LLC. (O'Connell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
7 7 notice Appear* Tue 09/03 4:23 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2024 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order Text-Only Reassignment Tue 08/13 9:09 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman to District Judge Robert J. White pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-020. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
6 6 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Fri 08/02 9:43 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (O'Connell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
notice Error Mon 07/01 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Nichole Ann Omilion re5 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (MSyl)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Mon 07/01 11:36 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The parties are ordered to review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and Judge Leitmans practice guidelines and FILE a Joint Discovery Plan with the Court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f)(3), on or before August 2, 2024. The Court will review the plan and determine whether to set a scheduling conference or enter a scheduling order based upon the filed plan. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
5 5 service Certificate of Service Fri 06/28 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beth Morrison Rule 26(a) Disclosure Statement (Omilion, Nichole)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/28 9:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Defendant Signature Flight Support LLCs Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Signature Flight Support LLC. (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
3 3 notice Appearance Mon 06/24 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole Ann Omilion on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Omilion, Nichole)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 06/24 10:08 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 06/21 4:19 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Signature Flight Support LLC identifying Corporate Parent Signature Aviation US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Signature Aviation Limited, Corporate Parent Brown Group Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Brown Minority LLC, Corporate Parent Brown Bidco Limited, Corporate Parent Brown Midco Limited, Corporate Parent Brown Topco Limited, Corporate Parent Signature Aviation US Holdco LP, Corporate Parent Signature Aviation US Holdings GP LLC, Corporate Parent Signature Aviation USA, LLC, Corporate Parent BBA Aviation Finance, Other Affiliate Page Avjet Corporation, Other Affiliate Epic Aviation, LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Other Affiliate Eastway Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate Long Beach Fuel Consortium LLC, Other Affiliate Vail Valley Jet Center, LLC, Other Affiliate Eagle Avionics LLC, Other Affiliate Sunrise Jets Maintenance, LLC, Other Affiliate ESNY-SFSHPN, LLC, Other Affiliate Signature 8390, LLC, Other Affiliate Signature 7156, LLC, Other Affiliate Signature 8361, LLC, Other Affiliate Signature 8433, LLC, Other Affiliate General Aviation Flying Service, LLC, Other Affiliate General Aviation Aircraft Service, LLC, Other Affiliate Meridian Aviation, LLC, Other Affiliate Meridian Aircraft Service, LLC, Other Affiliate Hong Kong Business Aviation Centre (China) Limited, Other Affiliate Hong Kong Business Aviation Centre Limited, Other Affiliate Page Avjet Fuel Co., L.L.C., Other Affiliate Signature Tradewinds Washington National, L.C., Other Affiliate Signature Flight Air Inc., Other Affiliate TAC Air DAL GP, LLC, Other Affiliate TAC Air DAL LP, LLC, Other Affiliate CLT Aviation Partners, LP, Other Affiliate DAL Aviation Development Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Daedalus, LLC, Other Affiliate Ross Chester County LLC, Other Affiliate FBOASE, LLC (JV), Other Affiliate GB Aviation Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Signature Aviation FBO Canada Inc., Other Affiliate Landmark Aviation (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate Signature Canada FBO Services, Inc., Other Affiliate RSS Jet Centre Limited, Other Affiliate Ocean Sky Jet Centre SLU, Other Affiliate RSS Jet Centre (Prestwick) Limited, Other Affiliate Downstream Aviation, LLC, Other Affiliate QT Petroleum on Demand, LLC, Other Affiliate EPIC Card Services, LLC, Other Affiliate EPIC International, LLC, Other Affiliate Signature Select FBO LLC, Other Affiliate BBA Diagnostics, L.L.C., Other Affiliate BBA Aviation Insurances (Vermont), Inc., Other Affiliate Signature Select Guarantor LLC, Other Affiliate Global Infrastructure Partners Funds, Other Affiliate Blackstone Funds, Other Affiliate Cascade Investment, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Signature STT, LLC for Signature Flight Support LLC. (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 06/21 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Signature Flight Support LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 24-007896-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9838023 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: Wayne County Circuit Court, 22-008865-NO, Judge Susan L. Hubbard] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Michigan LARA Summary for Signature Flight Support LLC,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Mercadante-signed